All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR40
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Resolution recognizing the week of March 9 through 15, 2025, as "Pulmonary Rehabilitation Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR41
Introduced
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
A Resolution recognizing the month of March 2025 as "Irish-American Heritage Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR42
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Resolution recognizing the month of March 2025 as "National Nutrition Month®" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR43
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Resolution designating March 13, 2025, as "Nutrition and Dietetics Technician, Registered Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR44
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Resolution recognizing March 12, 2025, as "Registered Dietitian Nutritionist Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR45
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Resolution recognizing February 15, 2025, as "International Childhood Cancer Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR46
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
Passed
3/26/25
A Resolution petitioning the Congress of the United States to end the biannual time change and establish a uniform, year-round time system.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR47
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Resolution designating March 8, 2025, as "PIAA Wrestling Day of Champions" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR48
Introduced
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
A Resolution recognizing March 18, 2025, as "National Natural Gas Utility Workers' Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR49
Introduced
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
A Resolution recognizing March 21, 2025, as "World Down Syndrome Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR5
Introduced
1/7/25
Refer
1/7/25
A Resolution adopting Financial Operating Rules of the Senate.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR50
Introduced
3/19/25
Refer
3/19/25
A Resolution recognizing March 28, 2025, as "Drugs Kill Dreams Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR51
Introduced
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
A Resolution designating January 6, 2025, as "1/6 Day" in Pennsylvania to honor the law enforcement officers who defended our nation against the insurrection at the United States Capitol and the members of the Congress of the United States who proceeded to vote despite threats to their personal safety, on the four-year anniversary of the January 6, 2021, insurrection.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR52
Introduced
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
A Resolution designating the week of April 14 through 18, 2025, as "Local Government Week" and April 16, 2025, as "Local Government Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR53
Introduced
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
A Resolution designating the month of March 2025 as "Disabilities Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.