All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR68

Introduced
4/2/25  
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to fully cooperate with Federal efforts to eliminate the United States Department of Education, reaffirming Pennsylvania's sovereign authority over its educational system and recognizing the need for State-led education solutions to improve outcomes for Pennsylvania students.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR69

Introduced
4/2/25  
A Resolution designating the week of April 20 through 26, 2025, as "Conservation District Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR7

Introduced
1/7/25  
A Resolution designating the week of January 19 through 26, 2025, as "Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., Holiday Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR71

Introduced
4/9/25  
A Resolution recognizing the month of April 2025 as "Alcohol Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR72

Introduced
4/9/25  
A Resolution designating March 18, 2025, as "COVID-19 Day of Remembrance" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR73

Introduced
4/4/25  
A Resolution recognizing the week of April 14 through 20, 2025, as "National Osteopathic Medicine Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR74

Introduced
4/4/25  
A Resolution recognizing April 19, 2025, as "Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR75

Introduced
4/4/25  
A Resolution recognizing May 15, 2025, as "Senior Fraud Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR76

Introduced
4/9/25  
A Resolution recognizing the week of April 13 through 19, 2025, as "National Public Safety Telecommunications Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR77

Introduced
4/9/25  
A Resolution designating the week of May 18 through 24, 2025, as "Public Works Week" in Pennsylvania to coincide with "National Public Works Week."
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR78

Introduced
4/9/25  
A Resolution recognizing the month of May 2025 as "Myositis Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR79

Introduced
4/11/25  
A Resolution recognizing April 12, 2025, as the 161st anniversary of the Fort Pillow Massacre, in honor of the fallen soldiers who lost their lives during this battle.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR8

Introduced
1/22/25  
A Resolution urging the Governor to develop a comprehensive legislative plan to improve basic education in the public schools of this Commonwealth and to establish an advisory commission to study and make specific recommendations for components of the plan.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR80

Introduced
4/11/25  
A Resolution recognizing April 9, 2025, as "Appomattox Day" in Pennsylvania, in honor of the historic Confederate surrender in Appomattox, Virginia, which led to full emancipation in the United States and signaled the end of the American Civil War, and urging the designation of "Appomattox Day" as a legal holiday in this Commonwealth.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR81

Introduced
4/14/25  
A Resolution honoring the Super Bowl LIX Champions, the 2025 Philadelphia Eagles, and recognizing the Philadelphia Eagles as one of the greatest football teams ever to represent this Commonwealth both on and off the field.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records