All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6500
Introduced
6/7/23
Passed
6/7/23
House Resolution Extending Congratulations
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6501
Introduced
6/8/23
Passed
6/8/23
House Resolution Proclaiming June 12, 2023, To Be "women Veterans Appreciation Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6502
Introduced
6/8/23
Passed
6/8/23
House Resolution Commemorating "world Sickle Cell Awareness Day" On June 19, 2023
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6503
Introduced
6/8/23
Passed
6/8/23
House Resolution Proclaiming June 10, 2023, As The "day Of Portugal" In The State Of Rhode Island
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6504
Introduced
6/8/23
Passed
6/8/23
House Resolution Congratulating Aimee Couto On Being Named The 2024 "rhode Island Teacher Of The Year" By The Rhode Island Department Of Education
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6505
Introduced
6/8/23
Passed
6/8/23
House Resolution Honoring And Congratulating Neil D. Steinberg On His Retirement As The President And Ceo Of The Rhode Island Foundation
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6506
Introduced
6/8/23
Refer
6/8/23
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Review And Provide Recommendations For Professional And Labor-management Standards That Provide School-based Flexibility And Accountability For Employees Of The Providence Public Schools
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6507
Introduced
6/8/23
Refer
6/8/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Enrolled
6/16/23
Passed
6/26/23
Provides that school policies which provide for excused absences for participation in a sport or other extracurricular activity be amended and deemed to include attending agricultural fairs as an excused absence.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6508
Introduced
6/8/23
Refer
6/8/23
Prohibits the declawing of cats by any surgical procedure to amputate or modify a portion of a cat's paw in order to remove the cat's claws. Does not apply to any procedure performed for a therapeutic purpose.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6509
Introduced
6/8/23
Refer
6/8/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Authorizes the town of Richmond's town council to partially exempt qualifying real estate from the payment of property taxes or to determine a stabilized amount of taxes to be paid on qualifying real property.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6510
Introduced
6/9/23
Refer
6/9/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/14/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Passed
6/27/23
Concurrent Resolution Relating To Approval For A Submerged Land Lease In Connection With The Revolution Wind Project
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6511
Introduced
6/10/23
Refer
6/10/23
Provides that the director of department of environment management shall by January 1, 2024 designate areas where operating recreational vehicles shall be permitted.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6512
Introduced
6/10/23
Refer
6/10/23
Joint Resolution Amending The Joint Resolution Creating A Permanent Legislative Commission On Child Care In Rhode Island (this Resolution Would Amend The Commission Name, Membership, Appointment Process, Purpose, Funding Allowance Designation, Timeline For Membership, And Meeting Schedules.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6513
Introduced
6/10/23
Refer
6/10/23
Provides that the city of Woonsocket not be required to accept additional residential properties subject to the alternative tax assessment due to its stock of affordable housing meeting the 10% housing requirement.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6514
Introduced
6/12/23
Engrossed
6/12/23
Enrolled
6/14/23
Passed
6/23/23
Allows Robert Louis DiMuccio to join Paula Marie Fortin and Cosimo Anthony D’Elia III in marriage on or about July 1, 2023, within the Town of Smithfield, Rhode Island.