All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0025
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
4/27/23
Engrossed
5/9/23
Refer
5/10/23
Requires the dept of behavioral healthcare/developmental disabilities/hospitals to coordinate with the DOH to propose revisions to chapter 1.10 and 10.1 of title 23, including updates and revisions of statutory language and evidence-based best practices.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0026
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
3/23/23
Engrossed
3/30/23
Enrolled
4/4/23
Passed
4/7/23
Extends the expiration date of the Harm Reduction Center Advisory Committee and Pilot Program by two years, from March 1, 2024, to March 1, 2026.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0027
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
4/27/23
Engrossed
5/9/23
Refer
5/10/23
Requires coverage for residential/inpatient mental health services for detox/stabilization/substance abuse disorders without preauthorization or be subject to concurrent review during the first 28 days.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0028
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Increases the rate of reimbursement for in-network behavioral health care services below the medial commercial reimbursement rate and also Rhode Island Medicaid shall increase the rate of reimbursement.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0029
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
3/16/23
Engrossed
3/21/23
Refer
3/22/23
Report Pass
4/19/23
Enrolled
5/4/23
Passed
5/12/23
Validates and ratifies amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Tiverton, adopted and approved on November 8, 2022.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0030
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Defines light duty, non-emergency, emergency and zero-emission vehicles and requires the state to convert its fleet of vehicles to no less than fifty percent (50%) of vehicles in those categories by the year 2031.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0031
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Authorizes and empowers the department of transportation to plant pollinator-friendly species of trees, shrubs, grasses and plants.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0032
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
5/16/23
Engrossed
5/18/23
Enrolled
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
Provides for abortion coverage in the Medicaid program and repeals the abortion coverage exclusion for state employee insurance plans.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0033
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
5/30/23
Engrossed
6/6/23
Enrolled
6/12/23
Passed
6/14/23
Increases the civil penalty from $100 to a maximum of $1,000, whenever a seller or their real estate agent fails provide a completed seller disclosure form to the buyer.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0034
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Increases the maximum number of voters that a polling place can accommodate from three thousand (3,000) to three thousand five hundred (3,500).
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0035
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
6/6/23
Engrossed
6/8/23
Engrossed
6/12/23
Passed
6/19/23
Allows individuals, who have not reached the age of eighteen (18) years, to vote in a primary election, as long as the voter will be eighteen (18), as of the date of the general or special election.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0036
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Provides for contractor liability for debts owed to an employer or third party on the wage claimants behalf, incurred by a subcontractor.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0037
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Sets the minimum wage at fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour commencing January 1, 2024, and at twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour commencing January 1, 2025.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0038
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
3/1/23
Engrossed
3/7/23
Refer
3/8/23
Report Pass
6/12/23
Enrolled
6/15/23
Passed
6/27/23
Authorizes the city of East Providence to grant a retailer's Class B license to property located at 136 Taunton Avenue, Map 106, Block 6, Parcel 15 of the applicable city of East Providence tax assessment map.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0039
Introduced
1/18/23
Refer
1/18/23
Report Pass
6/6/23
Engrossed
6/8/23
Refer
6/9/23
Allows manufacturer-wineries to sell up to three (3) drinks of wine for on-site consumption or three (3) bottles of wine for off-site consumption or three (3) bottles of wine for off-site consumption.