All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1000
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Requires health insurance commissioner/Medicaid director convene a working group to develop models for reforming payment for healthcare insurers based on advanced value-based payment with annual reports to general assembly.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1001
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Amends the current law so that all home health care patients are entitled to receive home health care services regardless of their permanent or temporary residence.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1002
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Requires health insurance contract plans or policies to provide coverage for the licensed practice of naturopathy as provided in chapter 36.1 of title 5 effective January 1, 2024.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1003
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Authorizes the town of South Kingstown to adopt a local ordinance to delay the demolition of historic properties located in the town.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1004
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Passed
6/14/23
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Improving The Pawtucket Corridor (creates A Thirteen (13) Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Improving The Pawtucket Corridor, And Reports Back To The President Of The Senate On Or Before May 7, 2024, And Expires On June 7, 2024.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1005
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Report Pass
6/1/23
Engrossed
6/8/23
Enrolled
6/12/23
Passed
6/22/23
Amends the Central Coventry Fire District Charter to provide for purchasing, installing, operating and maintaining street lighting and the funding for its debt.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1006
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Amends several sections of law relating to zoning ordinances to provide uniform zoning standards for accessory dwelling units.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1007
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Creates an assigned registration number for short-term rental listings on 3rd party platforms.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1008
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Authorizes websites to be used for publication of legal notices and advertisements effective January 1, 2024.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1009
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/14/23
Enrolled
6/15/23
Passed
6/19/23
Permits the office of cannabis regulation to provide forms, procedures and requirements with respect to the advertising of cannabis products during the transitional period.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1010
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Report Pass
6/6/23
Engrossed
6/8/23
Enrolled
6/12/23
Passed
6/19/23
Changes the primary date for the election of delegates to national conventions and for presidential preference from the fourth Tuesday in April to April 2, 2024.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1011
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/14/23
Requires the department of children, youth and families (DCYF) to conduct periodic comprehensive needs assessments to determine whether the department’s programs and services meet the needs of children and families
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1012
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Report Pass
5/23/23
Engrossed
5/25/23
Refer
5/26/23
Report Pass
5/30/23
Enrolled
6/6/23
Passed
6/12/23
Allows Socrates Barbosa to join Theresa Matos Agonia and Alexander David Miller in marriage on or about July 15, 2023, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1013
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Prohibits discrimination on the basis of race by expanding the definition of race to include traits historically associated with race, including, but not limited to, hair texture and protected hairstyles.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S1014
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Amends the current requirement of payment of initial filing fee and service of process costs when the victim of crime is still owed restitution at the expiration of the case and seeks to enforce the civil judgment entered at disposition.