All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6320
Introduced
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
House Resolution Expressing Condolences On The Passing Of Jack Brantolino
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6321
Introduced
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
House Resolution Expressing Condolences On The Passing Of James J. Gillis
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6322
Introduced
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
House Resolution Reaffirming The Friendship Between The State Of Rhode Island And Taiwan, While Supporting Enhanced Bilateral Relations With Taiwan And Taiwan's Participation In The International Community
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6323
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Report Pass
6/14/23
Provides for the sealing of court files in residential eviction proceedings upon the filing of a motion.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6324
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Adds cartoons, drawings, comic books, prints, depictions or animations to the list of media that would be prohibited from being sold or available to those persons under the age of 18 years.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6325
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Defines ATV harassment and imposes mandatory prison sentences for a conviction under this chapter.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6326
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Establishes a disciplinary review process for police chiefs, and provides for an appeal to the superior court in the county in which the municipal police department is located.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6327
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Mandates that the work week be reduced to thirty-two hours and rate of pay for a thirty-two (32) hour workweek would remain the same as the rate of pay for forty hours.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6328
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Permits the city of Newport, by separate ordinance, to assess nonowner occupied residential properties used as short-term rentals for tourists under its Class Three category; commercial, industrial and residential real estate with 4 units or more.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6329
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Report Pass
5/2/23
Engrossed
5/4/23
Refer
5/5/23
Report Pass
5/18/23
Enrolled
5/23/23
Passed
5/31/23
Allows Puya Joseph Nili to join Jacqueline Azniv Kazarian and Chad Erik Austino in marriage on or about October 8, 2023, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6330
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Extends the deadline dates for commencement and completion of certain school building projects by one year to December 30, 2024 and December 30, 2029, respectively, in order to receive increased housing aid.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6331
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Increases the number of child care licensing inspectors to meet the national recommended average of one inspector for every fifty (50) to sixty (60) child care providers.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6332
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Provides the executive office of health and human services would submit a plan amendment to provide set rates for chiropractic services.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6333
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Report Pass
6/12/23
Engrossed
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Passed
6/24/23
Establishes a statewide exemption of fifty thousand dollars ($50,000) from the tangible property tax beginning January 1, 2024.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6334
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Creates a tax exemption of one hundred thousand dollars ($100,000) relating to assessment of municipal tangible property commencing with the December 31, 2024 tax assessment for taxes payable in calendar year 2025.