All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6365
Introduced
5/4/23
Passed
5/4/23
House Resolution Commemorating May Of 2023, As "national Skin Cancer Awareness Month" In The State Of Rhode Island
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6366
Introduced
5/4/23
Passed
5/4/23
House Resolution Extending Deepest Condolences On The Passing Of Reverend Mother Diana "red Doe" Spears Mars
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6367
Introduced
5/4/23
Passed
5/4/23
House Resolution Expressing Condolences
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6368
Introduced
5/4/23
Passed
5/4/23
House Resolution Extending Congratulations
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6369
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Adds the application or removal of eyelash extensions and the use of chemicals in the area of the eyelids to the definition of the "practice of hairdressing and cosmetic therapy".
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6370
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Report Pass
5/16/23
Passed
5/25/23
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For The Placement Of Solar Panels On Inter-state Highways (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study And Make Recommendations On Placement Of Solar Panels On Inter-state Highways From April 11, 2023, To April 11, 2024, And Would Expire On June 11, 2024.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6371
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Report Pass
6/1/23
Engrossed
6/6/23
Refer
6/7/23
Report Pass
6/14/23
Enrolled
6/15/23
Passed
6/27/23
Makes a number of technical amendments to the general laws, prepared at the recommendation of the law revision office. Article I contains the reenactment of titles 7 and 27 of the general laws. Article II includes the statutory construction provisions
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6372
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Requires DOT to notify any surrounding residential property owners and commercial businesses of any proposed temporary or permanent closure to vehicular traffic of any street, highway or bridge, and to hold a public meeting in regards to closure.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6373
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Report Pass
5/18/23
Passed
5/23/23
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Review The Cost And Status Of The State Of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, And Abandoned Properties And Provide Recommendations For Methods To Mitigate The Associated Expenses (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study And Review The Cost And Status Of The State Of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, And Abandoned Properties, From May 1, 2023, To May 31, 2024, And Would Expire On June 30, 2024.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6374
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Extends the commencement of substantial construction activities date, completion date or placed in service date, to December 31, 2026 and no project shall be deemed idle between March 9, 2020 and December 31, 2024.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6375
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Report Pass
6/8/23
Engrossed
6/12/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Passed
6/21/23
Establishes a new, temporary process in the department of children, youth and families, for the hiring of social workers and child protective investigators at the department for a one year period commencing on October 1, 2023.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6376
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Report Pass
5/30/23
Engrossed
6/1/23
Enrolled
6/6/23
Passed
6/12/23
Authorizes the town of East Greenwich to issue not more than $180,000,000 bonds and notes to finance the acquisition, construction, improvement, renovation, alteration, furnishing and equipping of public schools and school facilities in the town.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6377
Introduced
5/5/23
Refer
5/5/23
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $600,000 For An Independent State Ombudsman Office To Facilitate An Individualized Education Program (iep)/504 Service Program (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $600,000 For An Independent State Ombudsman Office To Provide For A Facilitated Individualized Education Program.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6378
Introduced
5/8/23
Refer
5/8/23
Establishes the office of early childhood development and learning to manage a statewide early learning system for children from birth through age five (5), and ensure all children enter school ready to learn.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6379
Introduced
5/9/23
Passed
5/9/23
House Resolution Extending Deepest Condolences On The Passing Of The Honorable Ronald R. Lagueux, The Former United States Senior District Judge Of The United States District Court For The District Of Rhode Island