All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6410
Introduced
5/17/23
Refer
5/17/23
Allows for the wholesale sale of cannabis seeds and clones by licensees to licensed cultivators or compassion centers.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6411
Introduced
5/17/23
Refer
5/17/23
Report Pass
5/25/23
Engrossed
6/7/23
Enrolled
6/13/23
Passed
6/22/23
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Keegan Dinagen Post 1023 Veterans Of Foreign Wars
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6412
Introduced
5/17/23
Refer
5/17/23
Report Pass
5/23/23
Engrossed
6/6/23
Refer
6/7/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Enrolled
6/15/23
Passed
6/23/23
Allows the Honorable Brian Rea to join Monique Diana Belisle and Angelo Anthony Riccitelli in marriage on or about August 18, 2023, within the Town of Exeter, Rhode Island.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6413
Introduced
5/17/23
Refer
5/17/23
Amends sections of law relating to retirement of various public employees and the calculation of their final average salary and service accruals.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6414
Introduced
5/17/23
Refer
5/17/23
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $300,000 To Roger Williams University For The Roger Williams University Law School Business Start-up Clinic (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $300,000 To Roger Williams University For The Roger Williams University Law School Business Start-up Clinic.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6415
Introduced
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
House Resolution Expressing Condolences On The Passing Of The Honorable Bryan K. Wilson
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6416
Introduced
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
House Resolution Honoring And Celebrating "armed Forces Day" On May 20th, 2023, In The State Of Rhode Island
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6417
Introduced
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
House Resolution Proclaiming The Week Of May 14 Through May 20, 2023, To Be "national Police Week" In The State Of Rhode Island, In Remembrance Of All The Police And Law Enforcement Officers Who Have Lost Their Lives In The Line Of Duty
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6418
Introduced
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
House Resolution Expressing Condolences
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6419
Introduced
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
House Resolution Extending Congratulations
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6420
Introduced
5/18/23
Passed
5/18/23
House Resolution Congratulating Tyler Kolek Of Cumberland, Rhode Island, On His Outstanding Season With The Marquette University Basketball Team, And For Leading The Golden Eagles Into The Second Round Of The Ncaa Tournament
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6421
Introduced
5/19/23
Refer
5/19/23
Requires helmets be worn by all riders, regardless of age, while riding any electric bicycle or electric motorized bicycle.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6422
Introduced
5/19/23
Refer
5/19/23
Report Pass
6/7/23
Passed
6/12/23
House Resolution Creating A Legislative Study Commission To Evaluate And Provide Recommendations On Mandated Safety Protocols For Rhode Island Schools (creates A 21 Member Commission To Evaluate And Provide Recommendations On Mandated Safety Protocols For Ri Schools, And Who Would Report Back To The House By February 28, 2024, And Expire On April 30, 2024.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6423
Introduced
5/19/23
Refer
5/19/23
Report Pass
6/12/23
Passed
6/13/23
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Department Of Administration And The Office Of Information Technology To Review And Evaluate The Use And Development Of Artificial Intelligence (ai) And Automated Decision Systems And Provide Recommendations Regarding Ongoing And Upcoming Plans To Expand Their Use And Current Security And Implementation Procedures
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6424
Introduced
5/19/23
Refer
5/19/23
Report Pass
6/12/23
Engrossed
6/14/23
Enrolled
6/15/23
Passed
6/23/23
Validate and ratify amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Coventry.