LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB17
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB17
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB17
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025
10:30 am
Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs
E2.016
HB17
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB34
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB41
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Considered in Calendars
HB118
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB119
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB127
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB128
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB129
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
HB130
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
HB132
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB133
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call