All Bills - Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR319
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring Representative Irma Rangel and the sixth anniversary of the opening of the Irma Lerma Rangel Young Women's Leadership School in Dallas.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR32
Introduced
11/12/08
Refer
2/18/09
Enrolled
3/13/09
Passed
3/13/09
In memory of Mary Finch Ridout of Austin.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR320
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Recognizing July 24, 2010, as American Mexican Day.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR321
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Commemorating the fourth anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2010.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR322
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring the Dallas Association for Bilingual Education in 2010 for its outstanding record of service to the community.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR323
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Commemorating Cinco de Mayo, 2010.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR324
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring the life of Cesar E. Chavez on March 31, 2010, the 83rd anniversary of his birth.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR325
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2010, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR326
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation for their contributions to the 2010 Texas Missions of Mercy.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR327
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2010, the 22nd anniversary of his death.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR328
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring Oak Cliff on the occasion of the 107th anniversary of its annexation to Dallas.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR329
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Commemorating the 162nd anniversary of the date the Treaty of Guadalupe Hidalgo was signed, ending the Mexican War.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR33
Introduced
11/12/08
Refer
2/18/09
Enrolled
3/13/09
Passed
3/13/09
In memory of Shirley-Mae Jane King of Ingram.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR330
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Recognizing the 23rd annual Grand Prairie Cinco de Mayo Celebration.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR331
Introduced
2/6/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring the life of Benito Juarez on March 21, 2010, the 204th anniversary of his birth.