All Bills - Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR440
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Congratulating Deputy Chief Wilbur Montgomery on his retirement from the Mesquite Fire Department.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR441
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Commending all those who participated in National Black HIV/AIDS Awareness Day on February 7, 2009.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR442
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
In memory of Elaine Nicholas Lieck of San Antonio.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR443
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
2/26/09
Passed
2/26/09
Recognizing February 25, 2009, as Justices of the Peace and Constables Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR444
Introduced
2/12/09
Enrolled
2/19/09
Passed
2/19/09
Recognizing February 18, 2009, as Stephen F. Austin State University Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR445
Introduced
2/12/09
Enrolled
2/19/09
Passed
2/19/09
Honoring Ed and Gwen Cole of Nacogdoches for their service to the community and to Stephen F. Austin State University.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR446
Introduced
2/12/09
Enrolled
2/20/09
Passed
2/20/09
Recognizing February 18 and 19, 2009, as Nacogdoches-SFASU Days at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR447
Introduced
2/12/09
Enrolled
2/20/09
Passed
2/20/09
Honoring author Harold Fickett of Nacogdoches on his literary achievements and his contributions to his community.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR448
Introduced
2/12/09
Enrolled
2/18/09
Passed
2/18/09
Recognizing February 17, 2009, as El Paso Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR449
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/19/09
Enrolled
3/18/09
Passed
3/18/09
Honoring Carol Foy of Spicewood for her record-breaking flight around the world in a single-engine plane.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR45
Introduced
11/19/08
Refer
2/18/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Congratulating Katy Magazine on its receipt of eight Best of Texas Awards from the Texas Community Newspapers Association.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR450
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/23/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Recognizing February 16, 2009, as Texas SkillsUSA Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR451
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/23/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring Shepard Elementary School of Plano on its selection as a 2008 No Child Left Behind--Blue Ribbon School.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR452
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/23/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring Naoma and M. Allen Anderson Elementary School of Plano on its selection as a 2008 No Child Left Behind--Blue Ribbon School.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR453
Introduced
2/12/09
Refer
2/23/09
Enrolled
3/16/09
Passed
3/16/09
Honoring Alice Louise Boone of Burleson on the occasion of her 100th birthday.