All Bills - Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR536

Introduced
2/19/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/17/09  
Congratulating Captain Robert Nolan on his return from his military deployment.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR537

Introduced
2/19/09  
Recognizing members of the Austin Area Life Affirming Coalition who are visiting the State Capitol on February 24, 2009.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR538

Introduced
2/19/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/17/09  
Congratulating Fire Marshal Kurt Harris on his retirement from the Weatherford Fire Department.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR539

Introduced
2/19/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
2/26/09  
Recognizing February 25, 2009, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR54

Introduced
11/25/08  
Refer
2/18/09  
Enrolled
3/13/09  
Congratulating Dr. Zachary R. Hodges on his 61st birthday.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR540

Introduced
2/19/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
4/2/09  
Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez on March 31, 2009, Cesar Chavez Day.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR541

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
2/25/09  
Recognizing February 24, 2009, as Panhandle Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR542

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
2/25/09  
Honoring Joel Davis Sugg, Jr., of Katy on his 80th birthday.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR543

Introduced
2/20/09  
Enrolled
2/24/09  
Honoring Emily Elizabeth Gould of Fort Worth on receiving the Girl Scout Gold Award.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR544

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/17/09  
In memory of John Robert Kleimann of Willis.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR545

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Honoring Command Master Chief James Brown for his service in the U.S. Navy.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR546

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Honoring BEST Leadership on the fifth anniversary of its founding.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR547

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
2/26/09  
Recognizing February 25, 2009, as Coastal Bend Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR548

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Recognizing February 26, 2009, as Texas Parent Teacher Association Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR549

Introduced
2/20/09  
Refer
2/23/09  
Enrolled
3/18/09  
Recognizing March 25, 2009, as Big Spring Area Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records