All Bills - Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR672
Introduced
2/27/09
Refer
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Recognizing members of the Austin Area Life Affirming Coalition who are visiting the State Capitol on March 10, 2009.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR673
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Recognizing March 3, 2009, as Live Oak County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR674
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Honoring Coach Kris Hogan of Faith Christian School in Grapevine for his generosity and sportsmanship.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR675
Introduced
3/2/09
Refer
3/9/09
Enrolled
3/20/09
Passed
3/20/09
In memory of Senior Corporal Victor Antonio Lozada, Sr., of the Dallas Police Department.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR676
Introduced
3/2/09
Refer
3/9/09
Enrolled
3/20/09
Passed
3/20/09
In memory of Senior Corporal Norman S. Smith of the Dallas Police Department.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR677
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Recognizing March 4, 2009, as Parent Association for the Retarded of Texas Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR678
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Recognizing March 3, 2009, as Nurse Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR679
Introduced
3/2/09
Refer
3/9/09
Enrolled
3/20/09
Passed
3/20/09
Congratulating Rhoda Mae Kerr on her selection as the first female chief of the Austin Fire Department.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR68
Introduced
1/12/09
Enrolled
2/3/09
Passed
2/3/09
Recognizing Rushan Gao for his victories at the Huntsman World Senior Games.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR680
Introduced
3/2/09
Refer
3/9/09
Enrolled
4/1/09
Passed
4/1/09
In memory of William Judson Holloway III, co-chair of the Travis County Green Party.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR681
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Commemorating Texas Independence Day, on March 2, 2009.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR682
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/3/09
Passed
3/3/09
Honoring the Knights of Peter Claver and its ladies auxiliary on its luncheon and fashion gala on March 7, 2009.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR683
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Congratulating George W. Wilkins on his retirement from the Upshur-Gregg Soil and Water Conservation District board of directors.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR684
Introduced
3/2/09
Refer
3/9/09
Enrolled
3/20/09
Passed
3/20/09
Honoring the Panola College nursing programs.
TX
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR685
Introduced
3/2/09
Enrolled
3/19/09
Passed
3/19/09
Recognizing March 4, 2009, as Texas Moving Image Industry Day at the State Capitol.