All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR37

Calling on Congress to repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR38

Urging Congress to abolish the current income-based system of taxation.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR39

Supporting prayers, including the use of the word "God," at public gatherings, and displays of the Ten Commandments in public educational institutions and other government buildings.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR40

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR42

Designating the city of Rockwall as the official Live Music Capital of North Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR43

Directing the Texas Water Development Board and the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to support the creation of a model water recycling project.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR44

Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR45

Urging Congress to bestow the Congressional Medal of Honor on Doris "Dorie" Miller for his heroism during World War II.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR46

Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 31, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR47

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR48

Recognizing January 31, 2017, as Moving/Trucking Day at the State Capitol, and congratulating the Southwest Movers Association on the occasion of its 100th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR49

Designating July as Train Safety Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR50

Inviting the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas to address a joint session of the legislature on February 1, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR51

Designating the 1847 Colt Walker pistol as the official state handgun of Texas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR52

Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records