All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR307

Commemorating the 35th anniversary of Grupo Folklórico Tabasco and Mariachi Los Coyotes at La Joya High School.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR308

Recognizing February 14, 2017, as Texas Aggregates and Concrete Association Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR309

In memory of Mervis Lowery of Etoile.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR31

Recognizing Serena K. Formby-Condon on the occasion of National Brain Injury Awareness Month in March 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR310

Congratulating Phil Danaher of Calallen High School in Corpus Christi on becoming the winningest high school football coach in Texas history.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR311

Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Lubbock Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR312

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Rio Grande Valley Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR313

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Texas Senior Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR314

Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Texas Anesthesiologists Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR315

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Run, Ride & Share Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR316

Honoring Tom Ward for 35 years of service to Matagorda County.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR317

Recognizing February 6, 2017, as 9-1-1 Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR318

Recognizing February 8, 2017, as Coastal Bend Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR319

Congratulating Dr. Marcelo Cavazos of the Arlington Independent School District on his selection as 2016 Region 11 Superintendent of the Year.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR32

Recognizing January 24, 2017, as Texas Juvenile Justice Professional Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records