All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR361

Recognizing February 16, 2017, as Greater Houston Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR362

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Space Day at the State Capitol and honoring NASA.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR363

In memory of Darleene Joy Warren of Galveston.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR364

Recognizing February 2017 as Black History Month.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR365

In memory of Ruby Lee O'Neal Greene.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR366

Recognizing March 15, 2017, as Waco Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR367

Commemorating the 100th anniversary of Robert B. Green Memorial Hospital in San Antonio.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR368

Recognizing February 27, 2017, as Southwest Region of National Black Law Students Association Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR369

Recognizing February 28, 2017, as North Houston Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR37

Congratulating Juanita Aguilar on the 45th anniversary of her restaurant, Casa Morales.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR370

In memory of Bertha Cuellar Gonzalez of San Antonio.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR371

Honoring Lydia Clay and Barrett, Emily, and Hunter Chenevert on the occasion of National Donor Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR372

Commending members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation and recognizing the 2018 Texas Mission of Mercy.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR373

Commending members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation and recognizing the 2017 Texas Mission of Mercy.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR374

Commemorating Texas Homemade Pie Day on February 16, 2017.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records