All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR415

Congratulating San Patricio County Judge Terry Simpson on his receipt of a 2017 Outstanding Community Leader Award from LULAC Council No. 1 in Corpus Christi.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR416

Congratulating Gabe Guerra on his receipt of the Ambassador of the Year award from LULAC Council No. 1 in Corpus Christi.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR417

Recognizing February 22 and 23, 2017, as Fort Bend Chamber Leadership Forum Days at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR418

Congratulating Wanda Adams on her election as president of the Houston Independent School District Board of Education.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR419

Recognizing March 29 and 30, 2017, as Rusk County Days at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR42

Commemorating the opening of Catherine Bethke Elementary School in the Katy Independent School District.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR420

Congratulating Kim Ogg on her election as Harris County district attorney.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR421

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Van Zandt County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR422

Recognizing March 9, 2017, as Hopkins County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR423

Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Zavala County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR424

Recognizing March 31, 2017, as Texas Association of African American Chambers of Commerce Black Business Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR425

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Orange and Maroon Legislative Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR426

Recognizing February 26-28, 2017, as Rockwall County Days at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR427

Recognizing March 2, 2017, as Hunt County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR428

Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Small and Rural Incumbent Local Exchange Carriers Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records