All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR429

Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Hill County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR43

Recognizing February 27, 2017, as Texas PTA Rally Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR430

Commemorating the groundbreaking ceremony for the addition at Westbury High School.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR431

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as TEX-21 Legislative Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR432

Recognizing the members of the Leadership Midlothian Class of 2016-2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR433

Commemorating the visit of the Grande Voiture du Texas and the "40 & 8" boxcar to the State Capitol on February 18, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR434

In memory of Dr. John Allen Ehrhardt of Dallas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR435

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Hood County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR436

Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Jacksonville Leadership Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR437

Congratulating Colton Engle of Boy Scouts of America Troop No. 181 in Lumberton for attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR438

Congratulating Irene Hirt of Midland on her 100th birthday.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR439

Congratulating Craig Yenzer on his retirement as head football coach and athletic coordinator at Midland High School.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR44

Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the founding of the Madisonville Sidewalk Cattlemen's Association.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR440

Welcoming members of Leadership Gainesville to the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR441

Honoring Jeannene Bryant on her nearly 27 years as the proprietor of Margie's Flower and Gift Shop in Lamesa.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records