All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR550

Congratulating Mae Beth Palone of Austin on the occasion of her retirement from the Independent Bankers Association of Texas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR551

Recognizing February 27, 2017, as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR552

Recognizing March 8, 2017, as Missouri City Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR553

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as University of Houston Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR554

Commending CITGO Texas Operations for its more than 80 years of economic and community service contributions to the State of Texas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR555

Congratulating Angelisa Rendon on being named the 2017 Youth of the Year by the Boys & Girls Clubs of Edinburg Rio Grande Valley and the South Texas Area Council.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR556

Congratulating Dr. Robin Battershell of Temple ISD for being named the 2016 Superintendent of the Year for Region 12.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR557

Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Sheriffs' Association of Texas Day at the Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR558

Congratulating Sheriff Dennis Wilson of Limestone County on his installation as president of the Sheriffs' Association of Texas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR559

Recognizing March 2, 2017, as Texas Head Start Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR56

Recognizing January 24, 2017, as Texas Southern University Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR560

Commending Ann Williams, founder of the Dallas Black Dance Theatre, for her contributions to dance and dance education.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR561

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Montgomery County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR562

Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Texas FFA Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR563

Recognizing February 27, 2017, as La Joya ISD Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records