LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Committees
Local & Consent Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR543
Congratulating the Birdville High School StageHawks Theatre Department on its invitation to participate in the Chapter Select One-Act Showcase at the 2025 International Thespian Festival.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR547
Congratulating the Tomball High School baseball team on winning the 2024 UIL 6A state championship.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR549
Commemorating the third annual Small Places Salsa de Mayo Festival in Houston.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR548
Commemorating the grand opening of Small Places' Finca Tres Robles farm.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR125
Congratulating Rice University on being named to Forbes magazine's list of New Ivies.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR123
Commemorating the 232nd anniversary of the birth of Sam Houston.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR139
Recognizing February 20, 2025, as Baytown Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR112
Commemorating the 190th anniversary of the adoption of the Texas Declaration of Independence on March 2, 2026.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR111
Commemorating the 189th anniversary of the adoption of the Texas Declaration of Independence on March 2, 2025.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR52
Congratulating Carlton and Lynda Beal of Midland on their 60th wedding anniversary.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR113
Recognizing January 29, 2025, as Leadership Corpus Christi Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR140
In memory of Deputy Jesus "Jesse" Vargas of the Brazoria County Sheriff's Office.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR151
Recognizing March 5, 2025, as Deer Park Chamber of Commerce Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR149
Congratulating Maria Guzman of Hutchins Elementary School on receiving the EXCEL Award for South San Antonio ISD.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR150
Congratulating Suzanne Kenoyer on her more than 30 years of dedicated service to the Judson Independent School District.
Page 37 of 53
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46