LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Committees
S/C on State-Federal Relations
Calendar
TX
House S/C on State-Federal Relations Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
House S/C on State-Federal Relations Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/01/2025
S/C on State-Federal Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB3484
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HCR112
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HCR125
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
05/01/2025
S/C on State-Federal Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB3484
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HCR112
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HCR125
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
03/27/2025
S/C on State-Federal Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HCR77
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HCR102
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HR559
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/13/2025
S/C on State-Federal Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB176
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB180
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB333
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
HCR35
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House