Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House S/C on Workforce Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/29/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/29/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/15/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/15/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
04/01/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/25/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce