Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Senate Administration Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/07/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/07/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
04/28/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
04/28/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
04/22/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S No action taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
04/22/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S No action taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
04/14/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 24 2025 10:40AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/14/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 24 2025 10:40AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/08/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM