All Bills - Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR324
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Raising awareness of esophageal cancer by expressing support for the designation of April 2025 as "Esophageal Cancer Awareness Month".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR325
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the city of Hialeah, Florida.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR326
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Supporting the designation of April 10 as "Dolores Huerta Day", in honor of the accomplishments and legacy of the trailblazing labor and civil rights leader Dolores Huerta.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR327
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Of inquiry requesting the President of the United States to furnish certain information to the House of Representatives relating to the operations of the Social Security Administration after March 12, 2025, including information on the Department of Government Efficiency's access to the Social Security Administration and to information in the possession of such Administration.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR328
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Expressing support for the staff of public, school, academic, and special libraries in the United States and the essential services those libraries provide to communities, recognizing the need for funding commensurate with the broad scope of social service and community supports provided by libraries, preserving the right of all citizens of the United States to freely access information and resources in their communities, supporting a strong union voice for library workers, and defending the civil rights of library staff.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR329
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Commemorating the second anniversary of the shootings that occurred in Louisville, Kentucky, on April 10, 2023, in the Old National Bank building, and near Jefferson Community and Technical College and the shooting on April 15, 2023, in Chickasaw Park, honoring the memory of the victims of the attacks, expressing support to all those impacted by these tragedies, and reaffirming the commitment of the House of Representatives to support all victims of gun violence.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR33
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/13/25
<p>This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of Korean American Day and honors the 122nd anniversary of the arrival of the first Korean immigrants to the United States.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR330
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
<p>This resolution recognizes Volkert, Inc., headquartered in Alabama, for its 100th anniversary and its contributions to engineering, infrastructure, and economic development.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR331
Introduced
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Supporting the goals and ideals of "National Youth HIV/AIDS Awareness Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR332
Introduced
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
Supporting the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2025, as the eighth annual "Black Maternal Health Week", founded by Black Mamas Matter Alliance, Inc. (BMMA), to bring national attention to the maternal and reproductive health crisis in the United States and the importance of reducing maternal mortality and morbidity among Black women and birthing people.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR333
Introduced
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
Recognizing the enduring cultural and historical significance of emancipation in the Nation's capital on the anniversary of President Abraham Lincoln's signing of the District of Columbia Compensated Emancipation Act, which established the "first freed" on April 16, 1862, and celebrating passage of the District of Columbia statehood bill in the House of Representatives.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR334
Introduced
4/17/25
Refer
4/17/25
Amending House Resolution 211 with respect to a national emergency declared by the President on February 1, 2025, and House Resolution 313 with respect to a national emergency declared by the President on April 2, 2025.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR335
Introduced
4/17/25
Refer
4/17/25
Supporting the designation of the week of April 21 through April 25, 2025, as "National Home Visiting Week".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR336
Introduced
4/17/25
Refer
4/17/25
Recognizing the historic abolitionist events surrounding the Pearl, and honoring its legacy in American history.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR337
Introduced
4/17/25
Refer
4/17/25
Recognizing linemen, the profession of linemen, the contributions of these brave men and women who protect public safety, and expressing support for the designation of April 18, 2025, as "National Lineman Appreciation Day".