All Bills - Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR379
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Recognizing the roles and contributions of elementary and secondary school teachers in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR38
Introduced
1/14/25
<p>This resolution elects Members to the committees on Appropriations; Education and Workforce; Homeland Security; Rules; Small Business; and Transportation and Infrastructure.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR380
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Supporting the designation of the week of May 5 through May 9, 2025, as "Teacher Appreciation Week".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR381
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2025, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women and Girls".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR382
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Providing a point of order in the House of Representatives during the 119th Congress against reconciliation measures that reduce benefits under the Medicaid program or the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR383
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Expressing support for the recognition of May 4 through May 10, 2025, as Wildfire Preparedness Week, the national event educating the public on fire safety and preparedness, and supporting the goals of a Wildfire Preparedness Week.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR384
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Recognizing the cultural and historical significance of the Cinco de Mayo holiday.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR385
Introduced
5/5/25
Refer
5/5/25
Expressing support for the designation of May 2, 2025, as "NKH Awareness Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR386
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Condemning recent attacks on the free press by President Donald J. Trump and reaffirming the United States commitment to preserving and protecting freedom of the press as a cornerstone of democracy.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR387
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Expressing support for the designation of May 2025 as "National Asthma and Allergy Awareness Month".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR388
Supporting the designation of the first week of April as "Adolescent Immunization Action Week" and recognizing the importance of encouraging vaccination for adolescents and young adults to protect against serious illness.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR389
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week, to be observed from May 6 through May 12, 2025.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR39
Introduced
1/14/25
<p>This resolution ranks Representative Celeste Maloy of Utah immediately after Representative Dale Strong of Alabama on the Committee on Appropriations.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR390
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in, or at risk of entering, the foster care system.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR391
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H. J. Res. 72) relating to a national emergency by the President on February 1, 2025.