All Bills - Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR392
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Expressing support for the designation of May as "National Bladder Cancer Awareness Month".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR393
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H. J. Res. 73) relating to a national emergency by the President on February 1, 2025.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR394
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
Expressing support for the designation of July 16, 2025, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR395
Introduced
5/7/25
Refer
5/7/25
Establishing a "Bill of Rights" to support United States law enforcement personnel nationwide in their work to protect our communities.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR396
Introduced
5/7/25
Refer
5/7/25
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 4, 2025, through May 10, 2025, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR397
Introduced
5/7/25
Refer
5/7/25
Supporting the designation of May 8, 2025, as "National Scam Survivor Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR398
Introduced
5/8/25
Refer
5/8/25
Condemning Iran's failure to comply with its international nuclear obligations.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR399
Introduced
5/8/25
Refer
5/8/25
Congratulating Gregg Popovich, former Head Coach of the San Antonio Spurs and the winningest head coach in National Basketball Association history, on his retirement.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR4
Introduced
1/3/25
<p>This resolution provides for the President to be informed that Rep. Mike Johnson of Louisiana has been elected as Speaker and Kevin McCumber has been elected as Clerk of the House of Representatives of the 119th Congress.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR40
Introduced
1/14/25
<p>This resolution elects Members to the following standing committees:</p><p>Armed Services</p><p>Education and Workforce</p><p>Energy and Commerce</p><p>Homeland Security</p><p>Judiciary</p><p>Oversight and Government Reform</p><p>Rules</p><p>Small Business</p><p>Transportation and Infrastructure</p><p>Veterans' Affairs </p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR400
Introduced
5/8/25
Refer
5/8/25
Recognizing the significance of Asian American, Native Hawaiian, and Pacific Islander Heritage Month as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR401
Introduced
5/8/25
Refer
5/8/25
Recognizing the 60th anniversary of SkillsUSA.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR402
Introduced
5/8/25
Refer
5/8/25
Honoring mothers, and recognizing the significance of motherhood and the impact mothers have on raising the next generation, on the occasion of Mother's Day.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR41
Introduced
1/14/25
Refer
1/14/25
<p>This resolution recognizes that Tamil Americans enhance the rich diversity of the United States and supports the designation of Tamil Language and Heritage Month.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR42
Introduced
1/15/25
<p>This resolution elects Members to the Committees on Agriculture; Foreign Affairs; Natural Resources; and Science, Space, and Technology.</p>