All Bills - Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR1
Introduced
1/3/25
Engrossed
1/3/25
<p>This concurrent resolution reauthorizes the Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies relating to the January 20, 2025, Presidential inauguration. The reauthorization is effective beginning January 3, 2025.</p><p>The joint committee is authorized to make the necessary arrangements for the inauguration of the President-elect and the Vice President-elect of the United States, including using the Capitol rotunda and Emancipation Hall for such proceedings and ceremonies.</p><p>The joint committee was established during the 118th Congress and consists of three Senators and three Members of the House of Representatives.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR10
Introduced
3/11/25
Refer
3/11/25
A concurrent resolution recognizing the essential work of the League of Oregon Cities.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR11
Introduced
3/31/25
Refer
3/31/25
A concurrent resolution supporting the goals and ideals of International Transgender Day of Visibility.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR12
Introduced
5/5/25
Engrossed
5/7/25
A concurrent resolution authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR13
Introduced
5/6/25
Refer
5/6/25
A concurrent resolution recognizing the critical importance of the United States Special Operations Forces community and expressing support for the designation of SOF Week.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR2
Introduced
1/3/25
Engrossed
1/3/25
<p>This concurrent resolution establishes the day, time, and manner for counting electoral votes for President and Vice President as January 6, 2025, at 1:00 pm. The concurrent resolution provides that the results of the count shall be delivered to the President of the Senate and entered on the journals of Congress.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR3
Introduced
1/3/25
Engrossed
1/3/25
<p>This concurrent resolution authorizes the Capitol rotunda to be used for the lying in state of the remains of Jimmy Carter, the 39th President of the United States. The lying in state shall take place from January 7, 2025, until January 9, 2025.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR4
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/13/25
<p>This concurrent resolution affirms the commitments in the Geneva Consensus Declaration on Promoting Women's Health and Strengthening the Family and applauds the signatory countries for their dedication to advancing women's health, protecting life at every stage while affirming that there is no international right to abortion, and upholding the importance of the family as foundational to society.</p><p>The resolution also states that Congress will work with the executive branch to ensure that the United States does not conduct or fund abortions, abortion lobbying, or coercive family planning in foreign countries.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR5
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/15/25
<p>This concurrent resolution states that, unless it is approved by Congress, the proposed joint interpretation of Annex 14-C of the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement (USMCA) prepared by Ambassador Katherine Tai (1) is of no legal effect with respect to the United States or any U.S. person, and (2) cannot be invoked by any federal agency in any legal proceeding nor may a federal agency assert that it has any legal consequences for claims made by a U.S. person. (Annex 14-C of the USMCA concerns certain investment claims under the North American Free Trade Agreement, the agreement which preceded USMCA.)</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR6
Introduced
1/24/25
Refer
1/24/25
A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress that tax-exempt fraternal benefit societies have historically provided and continue to provide critical benefits to the people and communities of the United States.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR7
Introduced
2/13/25
<p>This concurrent resolution establishes the congressional budget for the federal government for FY2025, sets forth budgetary levels for FY2026-FY2034, and provides reconciliation instructions for legislation that increases or decreases the deficit by specified amounts. </p><p>The resolution recommends levels and amounts for FY2025-FY2034 for</p><ul><li>federal revenues,</li><li>new budget authority,</li><li>budget outlays,</li><li>deficits,</li><li>public debt,</li><li>debt held by the public, and</li><li>the major functional categories of spending.</li></ul><p>It also recommends levels and amounts for Social Security and Postal Service discretionary administrative expenses for the purpose of budget enforcement in the Senate.</p><p>The resolution includes reconciliation instructions that direct several House and Senate committees to report legislation that will increase or decrease the deficit over FY2025-FY2034 by specified amounts. The committees must submit the legislation to the applicable congressional budget committee by March 7, 2025. </p><p>(Under current law, reconciliation bills are considered by Congress using expedited legislative procedures that prevent a filibuster and restrict amendments in the Senate.)</p><p>In addition, the resolution establishes reserve funds that allow certain adjustments to committee allocations and other budgetary levels to accommodate (1) reconciliation legislation, and (2) legislation that would not increase the deficit over FY2025-FY2034. The resolution also exempts reconciliation legislation that complies with this resolution from various budget points of order.</p><p>Finally, the resolution sets forth budget enforcement procedures that address issues such as adjustments to committee allocations and the budgetary treatment of the discretionary administrative expenses for the Social Security Administration and the U.S. Postal Service. </p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR8
Introduced
3/3/25
Refer
3/3/25
A concurrent resolution supporting the Local Radio Freedom Act.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SCR9
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the recognition of March 10, 2025, as "Abortion Provider Appreciation Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SJR1
Introduced
1/7/25
Refer
1/7/25
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to limiting the number of terms that a Member of Congress may serve.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress Senate Bill SJR10
Introduced
2/3/25
Refer
2/3/25
<p>This joint resolution terminates the national emergency relating to energy declared by the President on January 20, 2025, in Executive Order 14156. </p><p>The executive order states that the supply of and infrastructure for energy in the United States is insufficient to meet the country's needs. It defines <em>energy </em>as crude oil, natural gas, lease condensates, natural gas liquids, refined petroleum products, uranium, coal, biofuels, geothermal heat, the kinetic movement of flowing water, and critical minerals. </p><p>The executive order directs the heads of executive departments and agencies to use available emergency and other authorities to take certain actions to address this topic, including approving development of domestic energy resources, expediting the completion of authorized energy infrastructure (particularly in the Northeast, West Coast, and Alaska), and pursuing the use of emergency permitting provisions under certain environmental regulations.</p><p>The executive order also directs the Department of Defense to conduct an assessment of its ability to acquire and transport energy resources (particularly in the Northeast and West Coast), and invokes emergency military construction authority to address any vulnerabilities identified in the assessment.</p>