All Bills - Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR058

Introduced
3/20/25  
Engrossed
3/21/25  
House concurrent resolution recognizing April 18, 2025 as Electric Utility Lineworker Appreciation Day in Vermont
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR059

Introduced
3/20/25  
Engrossed
3/21/25  
House concurrent resolution honoring Linda E. Johnson for her outstanding State and national contributions to the prevention of child abuse
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR060

Introduced
3/20/25  
Engrossed
3/21/25  
House concurrent resolution designating March 25, 2025 as Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities Day at the State House
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR061

Introduced
3/20/25  
Engrossed
3/21/25  
House concurrent resolution recognizing March 2025 as National Athletic Training Month in Vermont
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR062

Introduced
3/20/25  
Engrossed
3/21/25  
House concurrent resolution commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Black Music Division at Bennington College
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR063

Introduced
3/27/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution congratulating the Brattleboro Food Co-op on its 50th anniversary and extending best future wishes
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR064

Introduced
3/27/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution congratulating Caitlin MacLeod-Bluver of Winooski High School on her selection as the 2025 Vermont Teacher of the Year and Jeremy DeMink of Edmunds Middle School in Burlington and Sonya Shedd of Wolcott Elementary School on their recognition as Distinguished Finalists
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR065

Introduced
3/27/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution recognizing May 2025 as Progressive Supranuclear Palsy Awareness Month in Vermont
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR066

Introduced
3/27/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution celebrating the role of tourism in the Vermont economy and designating April 10, 2025 as Tourism Economy Day at the State House
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR067

Introduced
3/27/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution commemorating the 250th anniversary of Ethan Allen’s planning, in Bennington in 1775, of the successful Vermont initiation of the American War of Independence and the associated expedition to Ticonderoga
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR068

Introduced
3/27/25  
Introduced
3/28/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution celebrating the role of the manufacturing industry in the Vermont economy and designating April 2, 2025 as Manufacturing Day at the State House
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR069

Introduced
3/27/25  
Engrossed
3/28/25  
House concurrent resolution designating April 2, 2025 as Early College Day at the State House
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR070

Introduced
4/3/25  
Engrossed
4/4/25  
House concurrent resolution designating April 10, 2025 as Alzheimer’s Awareness Day at the State House
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR071

Introduced
4/3/25  
Engrossed
4/4/25  
House concurrent resolution celebrating the 40th anniversary of the first class at Landmark College and extending best wishes for continued academic success
VT

Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR072

Introduced
4/3/25  
Engrossed
4/4/25  
House concurrent resolution commemorating May 9, 2025 as the 250th anniversary of Ethan Allen’s arrival in Castleton in association with the War for Independence

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records