All Bills - Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS004
Introduced
1/8/25
Engrossed
1/8/25
Passed
1/8/25
Enrolled
1/8/25
Joint resolution relating to Town Meeting adjournment
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS005
Introduced
1/10/25
Engrossed
1/10/25
Passed
1/9/25
Enrolled
1/14/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on January 10, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS006
Introduced
1/14/25
Engrossed
1/14/25
Passed
1/15/25
Enrolled
1/16/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on January 17, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS007
Introduced
1/15/25
Engrossed
1/15/25
Passed
1/16/25
Enrolled
1/17/25
Joint resolution to provide for a Joint Assembly to hear the budget message of the Governor
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS008
Introduced
1/21/25
Engrossed
1/21/25
Passed
1/22/25
Enrolled
1/23/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on January 24, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS009
Introduced
1/28/25
Engrossed
1/28/25
Passed
1/29/25
Enrolled
1/30/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on January 31, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS010
Introduced
2/4/25
Engrossed
2/4/25
Passed
2/5/25
Enrolled
2/7/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on February 7, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS011
Introduced
2/11/25
Engrossed
2/11/25
Passed
2/12/25
Enrolled
2/14/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on February 14, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS012
Introduced
2/12/25
Engrossed
2/12/25
Passed
2/13/25
Enrolled
2/14/25
Joint resolution providing for the election of a Sergeant at Arms, and three trustees of the University of Vermont and State Agricultural College
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS013
Introduced
2/12/25
Engrossed
2/12/25
Passed
2/13/25
Enrolled
2/14/25
Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of the University of Vermont and State Agricultural College trustees by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS014
Introduced
2/18/25
Engrossed
2/18/25
Passed
2/19/25
Enrolled
2/21/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on February 21, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS015
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/20/25
Joint resolution supporting Vermont’s transgender and non-binary community and declaring Vermont’s commitment to fighting discrimination and treating all citizens with respect and dignity
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS016
Introduced
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/11/25
Engrossed
3/13/25
Passed
3/13/25
Passed
3/14/25
Enrolled
3/13/25
Enrolled
3/14/25
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of seven Superior Court Judges and one Magistrate
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS017
Introduced
3/11/25
Engrossed
3/11/25
Passed
3/11/25
Passed
3/12/25
Enrolled
3/13/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on March 14, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS018
Introduced
3/18/25
Engrossed
3/18/25
Passed
3/18/25
Enrolled
3/21/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on March 21, 2025