All Bills - Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS019
Introduced
3/25/25
Engrossed
3/25/25
Passed
3/26/25
Enrolled
3/28/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on March 28, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS020
Introduced
4/1/25
Engrossed
4/1/25
Passed
4/2/25
Enrolled
4/3/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on April 4, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS021
Introduced
4/8/25
Engrossed
4/8/25
Passed
4/9/25
Enrolled
4/11/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on April 11, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS022
Introduced
4/15/25
Engrossed
4/15/25
Passed
4/16/25
Enrolled
4/18/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on April 18, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS023
Introduced
4/22/25
Engrossed
4/22/25
Passed
4/23/25
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill JRS024
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on May 2, 2025
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0001
Introduced
1/10/25
Refer
1/10/25
An act relating to providing Medicaid-equivalent coverage to all Vermonters
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0002
Introduced
1/10/25
Refer
1/10/25
An act relating to establishing the Office of Health Equity within the Department of Health
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0003
Introduced
1/10/25
Refer
1/10/25
Report Pass
2/21/25
Report Pass
2/25/25
Report Pass
2/26/25
Engrossed
2/27/25
Refer
3/11/25
Refer
4/2/25
Enrolled
4/15/25
An act relating to the transfer of property to a trust
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0004
Introduced
1/10/25
Refer
1/10/25
An act relating to maintenance and use of legal trails
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0005
Introduced
1/10/25
Refer
1/10/25
An act relating to guardianship proceedings
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0006
Introduced
1/10/25
Refer
1/10/25
An act relating to repealing the Commissioner of Labor’s authority to recommend a subminimum wage for individuals with a disability
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0007
Introduced
1/14/25
Refer
1/14/25
Report Pass
1/31/25
Report Pass
2/4/25
Engrossed
2/5/25
Refer
2/7/25
An act relating to automobile insurance
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0008
Introduced
1/14/25
Refer
1/14/25
An act relating to eligibility for Dr. Dynasaur for young adults up to 26 years of age
VT
Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session
Vermont Senate Bill S0009
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/15/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Report Pass
2/7/25
Engrossed
2/11/25
Refer
2/12/25
Enrolled
4/17/25
An act relating to after-hours access to orders against sexual assault