All Bills - Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR36
Introduced
5/2/23
Refer
5/2/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming May 1 to 7, 2023, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR37
Introduced
5/2/23
Refer
5/2/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming June 12, 2023, as Ronald Reagan Freedom Day in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR38
Introduced
5/8/23
Refer
5/8/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: celebrating May 5, 2023, as Skilled Trades Day in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR39
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative Sheryl Albers.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR4
Introduced
1/13/23
Refer
1/13/23
Engrossed
1/17/23
Refer
1/17/23
Passed
1/19/23
Relating to: providing for an advisory referendum on the question of requiring able-bodied, childless adults to look for work in order to receive taxpayer-funded welfare benefits.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR40
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: recognizing May 8 to May 12, 2023, as Teacher Appreciation Week in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR41
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: recognizing October 26, 2023, as Intersex Awareness Day in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR42
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming November 20, 2023, as Wisconsin's Transgender Day of Remembrance.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR43
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: commemorating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day and honoring the Hmong-Lao veterans who served alongside the United States in the Vietnam War.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR44
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: recognizing Asian American and Native Hawaiian/Pacific Islander (AANHPI) Heritage Month as a time to honor the important contributions of Asians, Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR45
Introduced
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Engrossed
6/7/23
Refer
9/28/23
Refer
10/10/23
Passed
10/13/23
Relating to: designating Hypertrophic Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day and efforts to educate people about hypertrophic cardiomyopathy.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR46
Introduced
5/24/23
Refer
5/24/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming May 2023 to be Maternal Health Month in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR47
Introduced
5/24/23
Refer
5/24/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: recognizing May 2023 as Law Enforcement Appreciation Month in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR48
Introduced
5/24/23
Refer
5/24/23
Engrossed
6/7/23
Refer
9/7/23
Passed
9/15/23
Relating to: honoring 2023 as the 100th anniversary of the Green Bay & De Pere Antiquarian Society.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR49
Introduced
6/5/23
Refer
6/5/23
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming May 2023 as Naturopathic Medicine Month in Wisconsin.