All Bills - Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR38

Introduced
5/8/23  
Refer
5/8/23  
Relating to: proclaiming June 2, 2023, as Gun Violence Awareness Day in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR39

Introduced
5/8/23  
Refer
5/8/23  
Engrossed
6/7/23  
Refer
6/8/23  
Relating to: proclaiming June 12, 2023, as Ronald Reagan Freedom Day in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR4

Introduced
1/17/23  
Refer
1/17/23  
Engrossed
1/19/23  
Refer
1/27/23  
Relating to: reaffirming Wisconsin's commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between the State of Wisconsin and Taiwan; supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) with the United States; and continuing support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR40

Introduced
5/8/23  
Refer
5/8/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Engrossed
5/17/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Relating to: celebrating May 5, 2023, as Skilled Trades Day in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR41

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Relating to: recognizing May 8 to May 12, 2023, as Teacher Appreciation Week in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR42

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Engrossed
9/14/23  
Refer
9/14/23  
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative Sheryl Albers.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR43

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Engrossed
5/17/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Relating to: commemorating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day and honoring the Hmong-Lao veterans who served alongside the United States in the Vietnam War.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR44

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Engrossed
5/17/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Relating to: recognizing Asian American and Native Hawaiian/Pacific Islander (AANHPI) Heritage Month as a time to honor the important contributions of Asians, Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR45

Introduced
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Engrossed
5/17/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Relating to: proclaiming May 2023 as Naturopathic Medicine Month in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR46

Introduced
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Engrossed
5/17/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Relating to: proclaiming May 2023 to be Maternal Health Month in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR47

Introduced
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Engrossed
5/17/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Relating to: recognizing May 2023 as Law Enforcement Appreciation Month in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR48

Introduced
5/16/23  
Refer
5/16/23  
Relating to: recognizing May 3, 2023, as National Bike to School Day.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR49

Introduced
5/25/23  
Refer
5/25/23  
Relating to: designating Hypertrophic Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day and efforts to educate people about hypertrophic cardiomyopathy.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR5

Introduced
2/6/23  
Refer
2/6/23  
Engrossed
3/14/23  
Refer
3/15/23  
Relating to: proclaiming February 2023 to be American Heart Month in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR50

Introduced
5/25/23  
Refer
5/25/23  
Relating to: proclaiming November 20, 2023, as Wisconsin's Transgender Day of Remembrance.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records