Alabama 2022 2022 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB80 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/11/2022

                    1 HB80
2 215767-1
3 By Representatives Lee, Clouse, Grimsley and Sorrells (N & P)
4 RFD: Local Legislation 
5 First Read: 11-JAN-22 
 
Page 0 1 215767-1:n:11/30/2021:PMG/bm LSA2021-2461
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9	A BILL
10	TO BE ENTITLED
11	AN ACT
12 
13	Relating to Houston County; to amend Section
14 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the salary of the
15 Houston County Sheriff.
16 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
17	Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975,
18 is amended to read as follows:
19	"§45-35-70.
20	"(a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation
21 of the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be
22 adjusted so that the monthly compensation paid to the holders
23 of the offices shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation
24 which was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on
25 April 1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this
26 subdivision shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
27 the beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise
Page 1 1 provided by law, at which time the amount of the expense
2 allowance shall be included in the base salary for the office
3 holders and the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions
4 from the expense allowance provided in this subsection shall
5 be made in the same manner as if the expense allowance were
6 salary as provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
7	"(2) Beginning on June 1, 2015 the effective date of
8 this act, the annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County
9 shall be 89 percent of the salary of the Judge of Probate of
10 Houston County on June 1, 2015 one hundred twenty thousand
11 dollars ($120,000). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
12 thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. Any The
13 increase in compensation in provided by this subdivision over
14 the salary of the sheriff existing before the effective date
15 of this act shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
16 the beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise
17 provided by law, at which time the that amount shall be
18 included in the base salary for the office holder sheriff, and
19 the expense allowance shall be void.
20	"(3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the
21 expense allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston
22 County Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1),
23 shall only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
24	"(b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district
25 commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on
26 December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
27 thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
Page 2 1 2A, Title 11, is hereby ratified and confirmed and shall
2 continue to be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston
3 County Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
4 compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
5 only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
6 in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
7	"(2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district
8 commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly
9 expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars
10 ($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for
11 performing duties within Houston County.
12	"(3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the
13 Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance
14 in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for
15 performing duties within the county. The expense allowance
16 provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage
17 reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county
18 vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same
19 manner as all other compensation and expense allowances
20 received by the chair of the county commission."
21	Section 2. This act shall become effective on the
22 first day of the first month following its passage and
23 approval by the Governor, or its otherwise becoming law.
Page 3