Alabama 2025 2025 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SB221 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2025

                    SB221INTRODUCED
Page 0
SB221
DBJATHT-1
By Senator Williams (N & P)
RFD: Mobile County Legislation
First Read: 04-Mar-25
1
2
3
4
5 DBJATHT-1 01/14/2025 THR (L)THR 2025-121
Page 1
First Read: 04-Mar-25
A BILL
TO BE ENTITLED
AN ACT
Relating to Mobile County; to further provide for the
compensation of the judge of probate; and to repeal Act
443-1967, 1967 Regular Session, relating to the compensation
of the judge of probate.
BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
Section 1. (a) Until January 20, 2031, the Mobile
County Judge of Probate shall continue to receive the same
base annual salary the judge of probate is receiving on
February 1, 2025.
(b) Beginning June 1, 2025, in addition to the base
salary authorized in subsection (a), the judge of probate
shall receive an expense allowance of forty-nine thousand
dollars ($49,000) per annum, payable in equal monthly
installments from the county general fund.
(c) Beginning January 20, 2031, the judge of probate's
base salary authorized in subsection (a) shall be increased by
forty-nine thousand dollars ($49,000) per annum and the
expense allowance authorized in subsection (b) is repealed.
(d)(1) Beginning June 1, 2025, the judge of probate
shall be entitled to all uniform increases in compensation
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 SB221 INTRODUCED
Page 2
shall be entitled to all uniform increases in compensation
provided to county employees.
(2) The amount of any uniform increase granted to the
judge of probate shall be based on the judge of probate's
total compensation.
(3) Any uniform increase in compensation granted to the
judge of probate during a term of office shall be paid as an
expense allowance until the start of the next term of office.
(4) At the beginning of each term of office, any
uniform increase in compensation provided to the judge of
probate during the previous term of office shall be converted
to salary and any converted expense allowance is repealed.
(5) Any expense allowance provided pursuant to this
section shall be treated as salary for retirement purposes.
Section 2. Act 443, 1967 Regular Session (Acts 1967,
p. 1116), relating to the compensation of the Judge of Probate
of Mobile County, is repealed.
Section 3. This act shall become effective on June 1,
2025.
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46