Alabama 2025 2025 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SR52 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/01/2025

                    SR52INTRODUCED
Page 0
SR52
JPAI2NN-1
By Senator Stewart
RFD: 
First Read: 01-Apr-25
1
2
3
4
5 JPAI2NN-1 03/21/2025 LMG (L)lmg 2025-1366
Page 1
First Read: 01-Apr-25
SR____ RECOGNIZING APRIL 1, 2025, AS ALPHA PHI ALPHA DAY AT
THE STATE CAPITOL.
WHEREAS, Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated,
the first intercollegiate Greek-letter fraternity
established for African Americans, was founded at Cornell
University in Ithaca, New York, on December 4, 1906, by
Henry Arthur Callis, Charles Henry Chapman, Eugene Kinckle
Jones, George Biddle Kelley, Nathaniel Allison Murray,
Robert Harold Ogle, and Vertner Woodson Tandy, known as the
"Jewels"; who recognized the need for a strong bond of
brotherhood among African descendants in this country; and
WHEREAS, Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated,
for 118 years has been a beacon of light to the community by
standing true to its aims of Manly Deeds, Scholarship, and
Love for all Mankind; and
WHEREAS, Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated,
has produced over 200,000 members that were inducted into
706 college and alumni chapters in the United States,
Europe, Asia, and the Caribbean; and
WHEREAS, Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated,
continues to make a difference in our society through the
fraternity's national programs of civic outreach initiatives
which accumulate over one million hours of community
service, producing $2.5 million in scholarships, and
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 SR52 INTRODUCED
Page 2
service, producing $2.5 million in scholarships, and
registering thousands of American citizens to participate in
the voting process; and
WHEREAS, the 17th Annual "Alpha Day at the Capitol"
convenes under the leadership of Alabama District Director
Michael Raynard Mayberry and District Deputy Director Kelvin
T. Wallace, Sr., representing 32 chapters across the State
of Alabama; now therefore,
BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SENATE OF THE LEGISLATURE OF
ALABAMA, That the members of this body commend Alpha Phi
Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated, and the Alabama District
Chapters for their outstanding contributions to this nation
and the State of Alabama and recognize April 1, 2025, as
Alpha Phi Alpha Day at the Alabama State Capitol.
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41