Arkansas 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arkansas Senate Bill SB427 Draft / Bill

Filed 03/15/2023

                    Stricken language would be deleted from and underlined language would be added to present law. 
*ANS284* 	3/15/2023 11:45:09 AM ANS284 
 
State of Arkansas    1 
94th General Assembly A Bill     2 
Regular Session, 2023  	SENATE BILL 427 3 
 4 
By: Senator Hill 5 
  6 
For An Act To Be Entitled 7 
AN ACT TO PROVIDE AN EXEMPTION FOR SPECIA L EVENTS TO 8 
ALLOW CERTAIN NEW MO TOR VEHICLE DEALERS AND NEW MOTOR 9 
VEHICLE MANUFACTURER S OR DISTRIBUTORS TO DISPLAY AND 10 
SELL CERTAIN VEHICLE S AT SPECIAL EVENTS THAT HAVE A 11 
SIGNIFICANT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON AN AREA; A ND FOR OTHER 12 
PURPOSES.  13 
 14 
 15 
Subtitle 16 
TO PROVIDE AN EXEMPTION FOR SPECIAL 17 
EVENTS TO ALLOW CERTAIN NEW MOTOR VEHICLE 18 
DEALERS AND NEW MOTOR VEHICLE 19 
MANUFACTURERS OR DISTRIBUTORS TO DISPLAY 20 
AND SELL CERTAIN VEHICLES AT CERTAIN 21 
SPECIAL EVENTS. 22 
 23 
 24 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ARKANSAS: 25 
 26 
 SECTION 1.  Arkansas Code Title 23, Chapter 112, Subchapter 8, is 27 
amended to read as follows: 28 
 29 
Subchapter 8 — Special Motorcycle Events 30 
 31 
 23-112-801.  Findings. 32 
 The General Assembly finds that: 33 
 (1)  A special motorcycle event sponsored by a city, county, 34 
nonprofit entity, or motorcycle special event owners' organization draws 35 
people from all over the state, other states, and even other countries; 36     	SB427 
 
 	2 	3/15/2023 11:45:09 AM ANS284 
 
 
 (2)  A special motorcycle event can provide a valuable increase 1 
in tourism for the state; and 2 
 (3)  The laws and rules related to the display and sale of 3 
motorcycles special event vehicles at a special motorcycle event must should 4 
be modified to lessen the restrictions that are hampering economic growth. 5 
 6 
 23-112-802.  Definitions. 7 
 As used in this subchapter: 8 
 (1)  “Motorcycle owners' organization” means an entity that is 9 
organized as a nonprofit entity or for -profit entity and in good standing 10 
with the Secretary of State; 11 
 (2) “Nonprofit entity” means an entity that has received tax -12 
exempt status from the Internal Revenue Service pursuant to section 501(c)(3) 13 
or section (501)(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, 26 U.S.C. § 14 
501(c)(3) or 26 U.S.C. § 501(c)(4), as they existed on January 1, 2007 15 
January 1, 2023; 16 
 (3)(2) “Public venue” means a location that: 17 
 (A)  Is open to the general public; and 18 
 (B)  Is not the address designated as the primary business 19 
address of a new motor vehicle dealer licensed by the Arkansas Motor Vehicle 20 
Commission or a used motor vehicle dealer licensed by the Department Division 21 
of Arkansas State Police; 22 
 (4)(3) “Significant positive economic impact” means an economic 23 
benefit of at least three million dollars ($3,000,000) to the state or a 24 
region of the state; and 25 
 (5)(4) “Special motorcycle event” means an event held at a 26 
public venue with or without an admission fee that: 27 
 (A)  Is sponsored by a city, a county, a nonprofit entity, 28 
or a motorcycle special event vehicle owners' organization; 29 
 (B)  Occurs not more than one (1) time each year for no 30 
more than seven (7) consecutive days; and 31 
 (C)  Includes any of the following that are invited to 32 
attend: 33 
 (i)  New motor vehicle dealers to display and sell 34 
motorcycles special event vehicles ; or 35 
 (ii)  New motor vehicle manufacturers or distributors 36    	SB427 
 
 	3 	3/15/2023 11:45:09 AM ANS284 
 
 
to display motorcycles special event vehicles; 1 
 (5)  "Special event vehicle" means: 2 
 (A)  A motorcycle; 3 
 (B)  An all-terrain vehicle; 4 
 (C)  A utility task vehicle; 5 
 (D)  A scooter; 6 
 (E)  A go-kart; and 7 
 (F)  A low-speed vehicle; and 8 
 (6)  "Special event vehicle owners' organization" means an entity 9 
that is organized as a nonprofit entity or for -profit entity and in good 10 
standing with the Secretary of State . 11 
 12 
 23-112-803.  Statements of estimated positive economic impact. 13 
 A statement of the estimated positive economic impact of a proposed 14 
special motorcycle event shall be submitted to the Arkansas Motor Vehicle 15 
Commission from an independent source such as, including without limitation a 16 
university, chamber of commerce, or other entity that regularly engages in 17 
the estimation of the economic benefit of an occurrence for businesses and 18 
industries. 19 
 20 
 23-112-804.  Significant positive economic impact determinations. 21 
 (a)  If the statement of estimated positive economic impact that is 22 
submitted to the Arkansas Motor Vehicle Commission establishes that a special 23 
motorcycle event has a significant positive economic impact, the special 24 
motorcycle event is exempt from regul ation by the commission as provided 25 
under § 23-112-805. 26 
 (b)  If the statement of estimated positive economic impact that is 27 
presented to the commission establishes that a special motorcycle event will 28 
not have a significant positive economic impact, then the commission shall 29 
determine whether the special motorcycle event is exempt from the provisions 30 
of this chapter and any rules promulgated by the commission. 31 
 32 
 23-112-805.  Authority to waive relevant market area and rules. 33 
 (a)  The Arkansas Motor Vehicl e Commission shall waive the following 34 
for a special motorcycle event that has a significant positive economic 35 
impact or is determined by the commission to otherwise qualify for an 36    	SB427 
 
 	4 	3/15/2023 11:45:09 AM ANS284 
 
 
exemption under § 23 -112-804(b) if no franchised motor vehicle dealer of a 1 
licensed manufacturer is represented participating in the host county of the 2 
special motorcycle event or the counties contiguous to the host county: 3 
 (1)  The provisions of this This chapter regarding relevant 4 
market area; and 5 
 (2)  The rules regarding m otor vehicle dealers in contiguous 6 
counties. 7 
 (b)(1)  The commission may promulgate rules for the issuance of a 8 
temporary permit to in-state and out-of-state new motor vehicle dealers and 9 
new motor vehicle manufacturers or distributors to participate in a special 10 
motorcycle event under this subchapter. 11 
 (2)  No rule shall be promulgated The commission shall not 12 
promulgate a rule that puts a greater burden on out -of-state new motor 13 
vehicle dealers and new motor vehicle manufacturers or distributors to obtain 14 
a temporary permit than the requirements necessary for a new motor vehicle 15 
dealer or new motor vehicle manufacturer or distributor to obtain a license 16 
from the commission. 17 
 (3)  If the commission establishes fees for a temporary permit 18 
under this subsection, the fees shall not exceed: 19 
 (A)  For an out-of-state new motor vehicle dealer, one 20 
hundred dollars ($100); 21 
 (B)  For a new motor vehicle manufacturer or distributor, 22 
two hundred fifty dollars ($250); 23 
 (C)  For an out-of-state salesperson, fifteen dollars 24 
($15.00); and 25 
 (D)  For a factory representative or distributor 26 
representative, fifty dollars ($50.00). 27 
 28 
 23-112-806.  Established and ongoing special motorcycle events. 29 
 (a)  A special motorcycle event that has been ongoing for five (5) 30 
years or more before July 31, 2007, and has had a significant positive 31 
economic impact in the past shall be: 32 
 (1)  Considered an established and ongoing special motorcycle 33 
event; and 34 
 (2)  Eligible to a presumption of a significant positive economic 35 
impact by the Arkansas Motor Vehicle Commission. 36    	SB427 
 
 	5 	3/15/2023 11:45:09 AM ANS284 
 
 
 (b)  Notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, an 1 
established and ongoing special motorcycle event under this section may 2 
continue to invite motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers that have 3 
participated in the special motorcycle event for the previous three (3) years 4 
new motor vehicle dealers and new motor vehicle manufacturers or distributors 5 
that have participated in an established and ongoing special event under this 6 
section for the previous thr ee (3) years may continue to be invited to the 7 
special event. 8 
 9 
 10 
 11 
 12 
 13 
 14 
 15 
 16 
 17 
 18 
 19 
 20 
 21 
 22 
 23 
 24 
 25 
 26 
 27 
 28 
 29 
 30 
 31 
 32 
 33 
 34 
 35 
 36