Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2330 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/27/2022

                      	HB 2330 
Initials FK/NM 	Page 1 	Military Affairs & Public Safety 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
 
 
HB 2330: department of public safety; continuation 
Sponsor: Representative Payne, LD 21 
Committee on Military Affairs & Public Safety 
Overview 
Continues the Department of Public Safety (DPS) for eight years.  
History 
DPS was established as a state-level law enforcement entity in 1969. Pursuant to A.R.S. § 41-
1711, DPS is responsible for creating and coordinating services for use by local law enforcement 
agencies in protecting the public safety. Its statutory responsibilities include: 1) patrolling 
highways and investigating highway collisions; 2) enforcing laws related to drug trafficking, 
organized crime, vehicle theft, gangs and more; 3) conducting fingerprint-based criminal history 
records checks and issuing fingerprint clearance cards in addition to other licensing and 
certification services; 4) maintaining the state's sex offender registration website and community 
notification compliance programs; and 5) providing scientific analysis services for various criminal 
justice agencies (Report No. 21-120). 
The sunset review process provides a system for the Legislature to evaluate the need to continue 
the existence of state agencies which are reviewed by a legislative committee of reference (COR). 
The COR is required to hold a public hearing, receive testimony from agency officials and the 
public and consider certain sunset factors in determining whether to recommend continuing, 
consolidating or terminating the agency (A.R.S. § 41-2953). 
On December 9, 2021, The House Military Affairs and Public Safety and Senate Judiciary COR 
held a public hearing and recommended that the Legislature continue DPS for eight years. DPS 
terminates on July 1, 2022, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3022.11). 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactively to July 1, 2022, DPS until July 1, 2030. (Sec. 1, 2, 4) 
2. Repeals DPS on January 1, 2031. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note