Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2337 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/22/2022

                    ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
RESEARCH STAFF 
 
TO: MEMBERS OF THE SENATE 
 FINANCE COMMITTEE 
DATE: March 18, 2022 
SUBJECT: Strike everything amendment to H.B. 2337, relating to affordable housing; 
qualified projects; eligibility 
 
Purpose 
 Narrows, retroactive to September 29, 2021, the abatements, exemptions or other 
reductions in state or local ad valorem property taxes for which a qualified project approved for 
the Affordable Housing Tax Credit (Credit) is ineligible to abatements, exemptions or other 
reductions prescribed in statutes governing the Government Property Lease Excise Tax (GPLET).  
Background 
 The Low-Income Housing Tax Credit (LIHTC) Program was enacted by the U.S. Congress 
in 1986 to finance the construction and rehabilitation of low-income affordable rental housing for 
individuals and families. The Internal Revenue Service allocates housing tax credits to designated 
state agencies which then award the credits to developers of qualified projects. The Arizona 
Department of Housing allocates available credits each year in Arizona (26 U.S.C. ยง 42).  
 Laws 2021, Chapter 430 established the Credit, administered by the Arizona Department 
of Housing (ADOH). ADOH must allocate $4,000,000 for the Credit in each calendar year until 
January 1, 2026. A qualified project approved for the Credit is ineligible for any abatement, 
exemption or other reduction in state or local ad valorem property taxes otherwise allowed by 
statute.  
 The GPLET was enacted in 1996 to allow government lessors to lease property owned by 
the lessor to prime lessees. In lieu of property taxes, prime lessees must pay a GPLET on the 
government property improvement to the county treasurer. Certain property and interests are 
exempt from GPLET, including: 1) property used for public housing; 2) property of a corporation 
organized or directed by a county, city or town to be used for public purposes; and 3) residential 
rentals occupied by the prime lessee. A city or town may, for a limited period, abate the GPLET 
of a government property that: 1) is located in a single central business district in the city or town 
and is subject to a lease or development agreement entered beginning April 1, 1985; 2) is located 
entirely within a slum or blighted area; and 3) resulted or will result in an increase in property 
value of at least 100 percent (A.R.S. Title 42, Chapter 6, Article 5).  
 There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
1. Narrows the abatements, exemptions or other reductions in state or local ad valorem property 
taxes for which a qualified project approved for the Credit is ineligible to only GPLET 
abatements, exemptions and reductions of state or local ad valorem property taxes.  
2. Becomes effective on the general effective date, retroactive to September 29, 2021. 
ANNA NGUYEN 
LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH INTERN 
 
MOLLY GRAVER 
LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH ANALYST 
FINANCE COMMITTEE 
Telephone: (602) 926-3171