Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2344 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/01/2022

                    Assigned to JUD 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2344 
 
military affairs commission; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Military Affairs Commission (Commission) for eight years. 
Background 
The Commission is required to: 1) meet at least annually; 2) meet on a regular basis with 
the Governor, the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives, either 
individually or collectively, to provide recommendations on military issues and report on the 
progress of the Commission; 3) annually meet with the appropriate legislative committees that 
have jurisdiction over military installations; and 4) advise the Governor and the Legislature on 
matters affecting the operational viability of Arizona military facilities, including military 
installations, military training routes, military restricted airspace, military ranges or areas under 
the jurisdiction of an active unit of the Uniformed Armed Services of the United States or any 
reserve or national guard component of the Uniformed Armed Services of the United States 
(A.R.S. § 26-261). 
The Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference and the House Military Affairs and Public 
Safety Committee of Reference met jointly on December 9, 2021, to conduct a review of the 
Commission. The Joint Committees of Reference recommended the Commission be continued for 
eight years. The Commission is set to terminate on July 1, 2022, unless legislation is enacted for 
its continuance (A.R.S. § 41-3022.14). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, the Commission until July 1, 2030. 
2. Repeals the Commission on January 1, 2031. 
3. Contains a purpose statement.  
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date.   
House Action 
MAPS 1/31/22 DP 15-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/10/22  56-0-4  
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 1, 2022 
ZD/HK/sr