Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2344 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/24/2022

                      	HB 2344 
Initials FK/KM 	Page 1 	Transmitted 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
House: MAPS DP 15-0-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 56-0-4-0  
Senate: JUD DP 8-0-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 27-0-3-0 
 
HB 2344: military affairs commission; continuation 
Sponsor: Representative Payne, LD 21 
Transmitted to the Governor 
Overview 
Continues the Military Affairs Commission (MAC) for eight years until July 1, 2030.  
History 
MAC provides the Governor and Legislature recommendations on military issues including 
actions necessary to sustain and grow Arizona's network of military installations, training and 
testing ranges and associated airspace. MAC is also responsible for reviewing applications for 
money to be awarded from the Military Installation Fund. MAC consists of 22 different members 
and is established within the Department of Emergency and Military Affairs (A.R.S. 26-261). 
Established by Laws 1978, Chapter 210, the Sunset Review process provides a system for the 
Legislature to evaluate an agency to determine if the merits of the agency justify its continuation, 
modifications or termination.  During the Sunset Review process, an agency is reviewed by 
legislative Committees of Reference (COR).  Each COR is required to hold a public hearing to 
discuss the sunset review and receive testimony from agency officials and the public (A.R.S. § 
41-2954). 
MAC is set to terminate on July 1, 2022.  On December 9, 2021, the House Military Affairs and 
Public Safety and Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference met to conduct a review on MAC 
and recommended that it be continued for another eight years, until July 1, 2030.  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, MAC until July 1, 2030. (Sec. 2, 4) 
2. Repeals MAC on July 1, 2031. (Sec. 1) 
3. Contains a purpose statement related to the continuation of MAC. (Sec. 3)  
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note