Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2865 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/21/2022

                      	HB 2865 
Initials AG 	Page 1 	Caucus & COW 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
House: APPROP DP 8-5-0-0 
 
HB2865: human services; 2022-2023 
Sponsor: Representative Cobb (with permission of committee on Rules), LD 5 
Caucus & COW 
Overview 
Contains session law provisions relating to human services needed to implement the FY 2023 
budget. 
History 
Arizona Independent Living Program  
A.R.S. § 8-521 establishes Arizona's Independent Living Program and the Educational Case 
Management Unit within the Department of Child Safety (DCS). The Independent Living Program 
provides services to youth who are subject of a dependency petition or adjudicated dependent 
and meet the following requirements: 1) in DCS custody, licensed child welfare agency or tribal 
child welfare agency; 2) at least 17 years old; and 3) employed or full-time students. 
DCS, a licensed child welfare agency or tribal child welfare agency must provide the cost of care 
for each youth placed in an independent living program. The monthly amount provided must not 
exceed the average monthly cost of purchased services for the child in the three months 
immediately preceding placement in an independent living program.  
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families 
The Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) Block Grant is used to: 1) provide 
assistance to needy families so that children may be cared for in their own homes or in homes of 
relatives; 2) end the dependence of needy parents on government benefits by promoting job 
preparation, work and marriage; 3) prevent and reduce the incidence of out-of-wedlock 
pregnancies and establish annual numerical goals for preventing and reducing the incidence of 
these pregnancies; and 4) encourage the formation and maintenance of two-parent families (42 
U.S.C. 601). The Arizona Department of Economic Security (DES) utilizes TANF funding to 
provide temporary financial assistance to dependent children in their own homes or in the homes 
of responsible caretaker individuals.  
According to the Joint Legislative Budget Committee, the FY 2023 Baseline Book continues a 
provision allowing DES to drug test TANF recipients if there is a reasonable suspicion that they 
are using illegal drugs. This provision was included in the FY 2022 Health Budget Reconciliation 
Bill (Laws 409, Chapter 409). 
Developmental Disabilities Assistance and Bill of Rights Act (Act) 
The purpose of the Developmentally Disabled Assistance and Bill of Rights Act (Act) is to assure 
that individuals with developmental disabilities and their families participate in the design of and 
have access to needed community services, individualized supports and other forms of 
assistance that promote self-determination, independence, productivity, integration and inclusion 
in all facets of community life through culturally competent programs (42 U.S.C. § 15001).  
    	HB 2865 
Initials AG 	Page 2 	Caucus & COW 
Provisions 
Independent Living Program  
1. Sets the minimum monthly stipend for foster youth enrolled in the Independent Living Program 
to be no less than $1,200. (Sec. 1) 
Developmental Disabilities Group Home Monitoring Pilot Program (Program) 
2. Establishes the Program within DES. (Sec. 3) 
3. Instructs DES to oversee the Program for three years and contract with the entity that has 
been designated by the state to conduct the Program and to operate the protection and 
advocacy system for persons with developmental disabilities in Arizona, in accordance with 
the Act. (Sec. 3) 
4. Requires, by January 1, 2023, the Program designated entity to: 
a) Monitor in-person the group homes providing services to clients with complex needs to 
determine, at a minimum, whether: 
i. The client with complex needs receives the services identified in the client's person-
centered service plan, including medication monitoring and habilitation treatment, as 
applicable; 
ii. The provision of services identified in the person-centered service plan of the client 
with complex needs has been effective in addressing the client's complex needs; 
iii. The services have resulted in a reduction in behaviors that interfered with the ability of 
the client with complex needs to live safely in the community; and 
iv. All physical interventions have compiled with the behavioral treatment plan of the client 
with complex needs and applicable state law. (Sec. 3) 
5. Directs, by January 1, 2023, the Program designated entity to: 
a) Investigate quality-of-care complaints received by the designated entity concerning any 
group home funded by DES; and 
b) Compile a comprehensive report of all observations and outcomes during the preceding 
year. (Sec. 3) 
6. Requires DES to educate service providers on the requirements of the Program and the role 
of the designated entity. (Sec. 3) 
7. Instructs the designated entity, by December 31, 2025, to report to the Governor, President 
of the Senate, Speaker of the House of Representatives and provide a copy of the report to 
the Secretary of State (SOS) regarding the observations and outcomes of the Program and 
any recommendations for service improvements. (Sec. 2) 
8. Repeals the Program January 1, 2027. (Sec. 4) 
DES Group Home Incident Report 
9. Outlines the information to be included in the Group Home Incident Report. (Sec. 2) 
10. Requires, by January 1, 2024, DES to provide the annual Group Home incident report to: 
a) The Chairpersons of the Health and Human Services Committees of the Senate and 
House of Representatives or their successor committees; 
b) Directors of the Department of Health Services and Arizona Health Care Cost 
Containment System; 
c) The designated entity conducting the Program; and 
d) Provide a copy to the Secretary of State. (Sec. 2)  
 
    	HB 2865 
Initials AG 	Page 3 	Caucus & COW 
Quality-Of-Care Complaints Referral System 
11. Directs DES, by January 1, 2023, to establish an expedited referral system to ensure that 
copies of all quality-of-care complaints are forwarded to the designated entity for investigation. 
(Sec. 2) 
12. Requires DES to identify quality-of-care complaints related to abuse, neglect and client safety 
as priorities for investigation. (Sec. 3) 
13. Specifies that if the designated entity substantiates an allegation in a quality-of-care 
complaint, the information must be provided to DES who will share the allegation with the 
service provider and the Independent Oversight Committee on Persons with Developmental 
Disabilities. (Sec. 3) 
TANF Drug Testing  
14. As session law, requires DES to screen and test each adult recipient who is eligible for TANF 
cash benefits and who DES has reasonable cause to believe engages in the illegal use of 
controlled substances. (Sec. 5) 
15. As session law, specifies that any TANF recipient who tests positive for the use of a controlled 
substance that was not prescribed for the recipient by a licensed health care provider is 
ineligible to receive benefits for a period of one year. (Sec. 5) 
Miscellaneous 
16. Defines terms. 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note