Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1180 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/24/2022

                    Assigned to APPROP 	AS PASSED BY COW 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1180 
 
technical correction; nuisance; nonconforming eggs 
(NOW: COVID-related; expenditures; reporting; federal funds) 
Purpose 
Outlines reporting requirements relating to monies allocated in the American Rescue Plan 
Act of 2021 (ARPA). 
Background 
The federal ARPA was enacted on March 11, 2021, and the executive branch has discretion 
in allocating ARPA monies. Arizona will receive a total of $4,200,000,000 from the Coronavirus 
State Fiscal Recover Fund and has received $2,100,000,000 as of December 23, 2021. Monies in 
the Coronavirus State Fiscal Recover Fund are available through December 31, 2024 (JLBC).   
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Requires the following offices and agencies to report to the Senate President, the Speaker of 
the House of Representatives (House), the chairpersons of the Senate and House appropriations 
committees and the Director of the Joint Legislative Budget Committee (JLBC) on intended 
expenditures from specified funds as appropriated by ARPA: 
a) the Office of the Governor, before spending $10,000,000 or more for one designated 
purpose from the Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund and the Coronavirus Capitol 
Projects Fund; 
b) the Superintendent of Public Instruction (SPI), before spending $10,000,000 or more for 
one designated purpose from the Elementary and Secondary School Emergency Relief 
Fund; and 
c) the Arizona Board of Regents (ABOR), before spending $10,000,000 or more for one 
designated purpose from the Higher Education Emergency Relief Fund. 
2. Requires the Office of the Governor, SPI and ABOR, within 30 days after the last day of each 
calendar quarter through June 30, 2024, to report to the following on the actual expenditures 
of monies from the specified funds as appropriated by ARPA: 
a) the President of the Senate; 
b) the Speaker of the House; 
c) the chairpersons of the Senate and House appropriations committees; and 
d) the Director of JLBC.   FACT SHEET – Amended  
S.B. 1180 
Page 2 
 
 
3. Requires the reports of intended and actual use of ARPA of 2021 monies to delineate 
expenditures by agency and program and include descriptions of expenditure purposes.  
4. Asserts that the:  
a) Legislature intends that the executive branch report on its planned and actual use of any 
major additional federal aid to Arizona through federal legislation enacted by the end of 
FY 2022; and 
b) timing and frequency of the reports should be the same as required for ARPA expenditures.  
5. Allows the Chair and Vice-Chair of JLBC to provide recommendations to the executive branch 
concerning federal legislation qualifying as providing major federal aid to Arizona.  
6. Becomes effective on the general effective date. 
Amendments Adopted by Committee  
• Adopted the strike-everything amendment.  
Senate Action 
APPROP 2/22/22 DPA/SE 7-2-1  
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 24, 2022 
LMM/sr