Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1235 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/14/2022

                    Assigned to HHS 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1235 
 
acupuncture board; continuation  
Purpose 
 Continues the State Acupuncture Board of Examiners (Board) for eight years. 
Background 
 The Board is established to protect the health, safety and welfare of Arizona citizens by 
regulating and maintaining standards of practice for acupuncture. The Board's duties include:  
1) adopting rules regarding the practice of acupuncture; 2) initiating investigations and taking 
necessary disciplinary action for complaints; 3) evaluating the qualifications of applicants and 
issuing licenses to qualified applicants; 4) establishing nonrefundable fees; and 5) adopting rules 
for clinical training (A.R.S. § 32-3903).  
 The Board consists of seven Governor-appointed members, including: 1) three licensed 
acupuncturists who have practiced acupuncture in Arizona or any other state for at least one year; 
2) one member who is certified or licensed to practice auricular acupuncture or acupuncture;  
3) one member who is a licensed medical, chiropractic, naturopathic, osteopathic or homeopathic 
physician; and 4) two consumers who are not employed in a health profession, do not have any 
pecuniary interest in a school of medicine or health care institution and demonstrate an interest in 
Arizona health issues (A.R.S. § 32-3902).  
 The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 13, 2022, to review and evaluate the Board's response to the sunset review 
factors and to receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the Legislature continue the 
Board for eight years (COR Final Report). The Board terminates on July 1, 2022, unless continued 
by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3022.25).  
 There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, the Board until July 1, 2030. 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2031. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. 
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 14, 2022 
MM/CC/sr