Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1235 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/03/2022

                      	SB 1235 
Initials AG/HR 	Page 1 	Health & Human Services 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DP 7-0-1-0 | 3
rd
 Read 26-2-2-0 
 
SB1235: acupuncture board; continuation 
Sponsor: Senator Barto, LD 15 
Committee on Health & Human Services 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona Acupuncture Board of Examiners (Board) for eight years.  
History 
Established in 1998, the Board was created to regulate the practice of acupuncture. The Board 
licenses acupuncturists and certifies auricular acupuncturists for detoxification or substance 
abuse programs, acupuncture training and preceptorship training programs, continuing education 
programs and visiting professors. It also investigates complaints and enforces the standards of 
practice for the acupuncture profession. Since the Board's creation its membership has consisted 
of nine members, including four licensed acupuncturists, three consumers and two licensed health 
professionals all appointed by the Governor for three-year terms (A.R.S. §§ 32-3902, 32-3903, 
32-3924, 32-3926 and 32-3951). 
Laws 2021, Chapter 312 modified the Board's membership requirements as follows: 1) beginning 
January 17, 2022, one member who is certified or licensed to practice auricular acupuncture or 
acupuncture; 2) beginning January 18, 2022, two consumers who meet specified requirements 
and one member who meets prescribed licensure criteria; and 3) beginning January 20, 2022, 
three members who are licensed to practice acupuncture and have practiced in Arizona or any 
state for at least one year. 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health and Human Services Committees of 
Reference (COR) met jointly on January 13, 2022, to evaluate the Board's response to the sunset 
factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended the Board be continued for eight 
years (COR Final Report). 
The Board terminates on July 1, 2022, unless legislation is enacted for its continuation (A.R.S. § 
41-3022.25). 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, the Board on January 1, 2030. (Sec. 2, 4) 
2. Repeals the Board on January 1, 2031. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
4. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1) 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note