Assigned to COM FOR COMMITTEE ARIZONA STATE SENATE Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1276 state real estate department; continuation Purpose Continues the Arizona Department of Real Estate (ADRE) for eight years. Background ADRE is established to protect the public interest through the licensure and regulation of real estate, cemetery and membership camping brokers and salespersons in Arizona (A.R.S § 32-2102). ADRE oversees the business of licensees, land developers and real estate education institutions and monitors the sale of subdivisions, unsubdivided lands, timeshares, condominiums, membership campgrounds and cemeteries. ADRE participates in investigations and administrative hearings and administers the Homeowners Association Dispute Process (A.R.S. § 32-2199). The Real Estate Advisory Board (Board) is composed of 10 members appointed by the governor that each serve six-year terms. The Board advises the Commissioner of ADRE and provides recommendations as requested or necessary (A.R.S. § 32-2104). ADRE is set to terminate on July 1, 2022, unless legislation is enacted for its continuation (A.R.S. § 41-3022.05). The House Commerce Committee of Reference met on January 11, 2022, and the Senate Commerce Committee of Reference met on January 12, 2022, to conduct a review of ADRE. Both Committees of Reference recommended ADRE be continued for eight years (ADRE Sunset Report). There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this legislation. Provisions 1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, ADRE until July 1, 2030. 2. Repeals ADRE on January 1, 2031. 3. Contains a purpose statement. 4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. Prepared by Senate Research January 24, 2022 JT/CY/sr