Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1276 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 01/31/2022

                    Assigned to COM 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1276 
 
state real estate department; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Real Estate (ADRE) for eight years. 
Background 
ADRE is established to protect the public interest through the licensure and regulation of 
real estate, cemetery and membership camping brokers and salespersons in Arizona (A.R.S  
§ 32-2102). ADRE oversees the business of licensees, land developers and real estate education 
institutions and monitors the sale of subdivisions, unsubdivided lands, timeshares, condominiums, 
membership campgrounds and cemeteries. ADRE participates in investigations and administrative 
hearings and administers the Homeowners Association Dispute Process (A.R.S. § 32-2199). 
The Real Estate Advisory Board (Board) is composed of 10 members appointed by the 
governor that each serve six-year terms. The Board advises the Commissioner of ADRE and 
provides recommendations as requested or necessary (A.R.S. § 32-2104). 
ADRE is set to terminate on July 1, 2022, unless legislation is enacted for its continuation 
(A.R.S. § 41-3022.05). The House Commerce Committee of Reference met on January 11, 2022, 
and the Senate Commerce Committee of Reference met on January 12, 2022, to conduct a review 
of ADRE. Both Committees of Reference recommended ADRE be continued for eight years 
(ADRE Sunset Report). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, ADRE until July 1, 2030. 
2. Repeals ADRE on January 1, 2031. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
January 24, 2022 
JT/CY/sr