Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1276 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/25/2022

                      	SB 1276 
Initials PRB/JL 	Page 1 	Commerce 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-fifth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: COM DP 9-0-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 27-1-2-0 
 
SB 1276: state real estate department; continuation 
Sponsor: Senator Mesnard, LD 17 
Committee on Commerce 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona Department of Real Estate (ADRE) for eight years. 
History 
Arizona Department of Real Estate 
ADRE was established in 1921 and administers real estate laws for the purpose of protecting the 
public interest through licensure and regulation of the real estate profession in Arizona. ADRE 
regulates and issues licenses for real estate and membership camping brokers and salespersons 
and for cemeteries. ADRE oversees the activities of licensees, investigates complaints against 
licensees and land developers, participates in administrative hearings and administers the 
Homeowners Association Dispute Process. ADRE is directed by the Real Estate Commissioner, 
who is appointed by the Governor (Title 32, Chapter 20, A.R.S.). 
Sunset Review Process 
The sunset review process provides a system for the Legislature to evaluate the need to continue 
the existence of state agencies which are reviewed by a Legislative Committee of Reference 
(COR). The COR is required to hold a public hearing, receive testimony from agency officials and 
the public and consider certain sunset factors in determining whether to recommend continuing, 
consolidating or terminating the agency (A.R.S § 41-2954).  
On January 11, 2022, the House Commerce COR held a public hearing and recommended that 
the Legislature continue ADRE for eight years. ADRE terminates on July 1, 2022, unless 
continued by the Legislature (COR minutes; A.R.S. § 41-3022.05).  
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, ADRE until July 1, 2030. (Sec. 1, 2, 4) 
2. Repeals ADRE on January 1, 2031. (Sec. 2) 
3. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 3) 
 
 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note