Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1401 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/22/2022

                    Senate Engrossed   continuation; state department of corrections.             State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022           SENATE BILL 1401                An Act   repealing section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.15; relating to the state department of corrections.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

 

Senate Engrossed   continuation; state department of corrections.
State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
SENATE BILL 1401

Senate Engrossed

 

continuation; state department of corrections.

 

 

 

 

State of Arizona

Senate

Fifty-fifth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2022

 

 

 

SENATE BILL 1401

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.15; relating to the state department of corrections.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.15, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.15. State department of corrections; termination July 1, 2030 A. THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TERMINATES ON JULY 1, 2030. B. TITLE 41, CHAPTER 11 and this section are REPEALED ON JANUARY 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state department of corrections to encompass the correctional programs of this state and to provide supervisory staff and administrative functions at the state level for all matters relating to the institutionalization, rehabilitation, parole and community supervision functions of all adult offenders. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.15, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3030.15. State department of corrections; termination July 1, 2030

A. THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TERMINATES ON JULY 1, 2030.

B. TITLE 41, CHAPTER 11 and this section are REPEALED ON JANUARY 1, 2031.

END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state department of corrections to encompass the correctional programs of this state and to provide supervisory staff and administrative functions at the state level for all matters relating to the institutionalization, rehabilitation, parole and community supervision functions of all adult offenders.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.