Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1401 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/08/2022

                    Assigned to JUD 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1401 
 
continuation; state department of corrections. 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry (ADCRR) 
for eight years. 
Background 
The ADCRR serves the purpose of encompassing the various institutions, facilities and 
programs which are now or may become a part of the correctional program of Arizona, and to 
provide the supervisory staff and administrative functions at the state level of all matters relating 
to the institutionalization, rehabilitation and community supervision functions of all adult 
offenders (A.R.S. § 41-1602).  
The Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference met on January 20, 2022, and the House 
Judiciary Committee of Reference met on January 19, 2022, to conduct a review of the ADCRR. 
The Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference recommended that the ADCRR be continued for 
eight years (Senate COR Report). The House Judiciary Committee of Reference recommended 
that the ADCRR be continued for three years (House COR Report). ADCCR is set to terminate on 
July 1, 2022, unless legislation is enacted for its continuance (A.R.S. § 41-3022.15). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the State General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, the ADCRR until July 1, 2030. 
2. Repeals the ADCRR on January 1, 2031. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date.  
Prepared by Senate Research 
February 8, 2022 
ZD/HK/sr