Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1444 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 02/14/2022

                    ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
RESEARCH STAFF 
 
 
TO: MEMBERS OF THE SENATE 
 HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES 
COMMITTEE 
DATE: February 14, 2022 
SUBJECT: Strike everything amendment to S.B. 1444, relating to Arizona state hospital
 
Purpose 
Prohibits administration and employees of the Arizona State Hospital (ASH) from 
retaliating against a patient due to family participation in Arizona State Hospital Independent 
Oversight Committee (ASH-IOC) meetings and requires the ASH Superintendent and Chief 
Medical Officer to attend and participate in meetings.  Directs ASH administration to develop and 
implement an innovative clinical improvement and human resources development plan. 
Background 
ASH is a 260-bed facility, operated and regulated by the Department of Health Services 
(DHS), that provides long-term inpatient psychiatric care to individuals with mental illnesses, 
personality disorders or emotional conditions who are under a court order to receive treatment. 
Statute outlines a number of administrative requirements of DHS relating to ASH, including 
submittal of an annual report outlining ASH finances, collecting census data for adult civil 
commitment treatment programs and administering the ASH Fund.  
The Civil Adult Rehabilitation Program at ASH includes treatment units that specialize in 
providing services to adults who are civilly committed as a danger to themselves or others, gravely 
disabled or persistently and acutely disabled. Patients admitted to ASH under the Civil Adult 
Rehabilitation Program must first have completed a minimum of 25 days of treatment in a 
community inpatient setting prior to admission. Forensic patients at ASH are court-ordered for 
either pre-trial or post-trial treatment as a result of involvement with the criminal justice system 
due to a mental health issue. The Forensic Adult Program includes individuals who have been 
committed through a court-order as part of a criminal process for patients who either: 1) are being 
housed in one unit providing pre-trial evaluation, treatment and restoration to competency to stand 
trial; or 2) have been adjudicated guilty except insane and are serving a sentence under the 
jurisdiction of the Psychiatric Security Review Board (A.R.S. Title 36, Chapter 2, Article 1).  
Statute establishes independent oversight committees (IOCs) under the Arizona 
Department of Administration (ADOA) for: 1) persons with developmental disabilities;  
2) children, youth and families; and 3) the mentally ill. Each IOC must adopt guidelines that govern 
its operation, subject to the approval of the ADOA Director. The ASH-IOC has oversight of 
patients who have been determined to have a serious mental illness and who are hospitalized and 
receiving behavioral health services at the ASH civil and forensic hospitals (A.R.S. ยงยง 41-3801; 
41-3802; and 41-3803). 
The Joint Legislative Psychiatric Hospital Review Council (Council) is a 10-member 
committee charged with reviewing, analyzing and making recommendations regarding at least the 
following: 1) psychiatric hospital capacity in Arizona, including the bed capacity at the ASH and 
 
 
MICHAEL MADDEN 
LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH ANALYST 
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES 
Telephone: (602) 926-3171  STRIKER MEMO 
S.B. 1567 
Page 3 
 
 
other public facilities; 2) the role of private facilities in addressing psychiatric treatment needs;  
3) innovative programs to ensure public safety while providing clinically appropriate treatment in 
the most integrated setting; 4) legal barriers; 5) current waiting lists; 6) barriers to accessing 
appropriate inpatient care; 7) licensing barriers; and 8) any other issues related to inpatient 
psychiatric treatment. The Council is required to submit a report of its findings and 
recommendations by December 31st of 2021 and 2022 (Laws 2021, Ch. 402). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
Arizona State Hospital Independent Oversight Committee 
1. Prohibits ASH administration and employees from retaliating against a patient because the 
patient or the patient's family participates in the ASH-IOC meetings. 
2. Requires the ASH Superintendent and Chief Medical Officer or their designees to attend and 
participate in scheduled ASH-IOC meetings. 
3. Requires the ASH Superintendent to ensure that ASH administration: 
a) fully cooperated with the ASH-IOC in all aspects of its work; 
b) facilitates and supports the ASH-IOC's activities; 
c) timely responds to the ASH-IOC with responsive information to each inquiry; and 
d) does not impede the ASH-IOC in discharging its statutory responsibilities. 
ASH Clinical Improvement and Human Resources Development Plan 
4. Requires ASH administration, by January 1, 2023, to develop and provide an evidence-based 
and innovative clinical improvement and human resources development plan and proposed 
budget to the:  
a) Governor;  
b) President of the Senate;  
c) Speaker of the House of Representatives; and 
d) chairpersons of the Legislative Health and Human Services committees. 
5. Requires the clinical improvement and human resources development plan to: 
a) be fully implemented by January 1, 2024; 
b) be developed in collaboration with the ASH-IOC, the Mental Health IOC, public and 
private community resources, community providers and guardians, families and 
representatives of ASH patients; 
c) identify necessary enhancements to ASH services, facilities and staff to provide statutorily 
required treatment and services to patients in each division, including treatment and 
services for secondary diagnoses;  STRIKER MEMO 
S.B. 1567 
Page 4 
 
 
d) provide options and recommendations to reduce the number of patients statewide who are 
seeking admission to ASH and to reduce the wait time for admission; 
e) identify optimal levels of acuity-based staffing with full-time employees and minimal use 
of contract staff as well as ways to increase the number of forensically trained clinical staff; 
f) include a pandemic response and preparedness plan that creates a set of clinical metrics to 
significantly mitigate the effects of the COVID-19 pandemic on treatment and ensures 
continuous ASH operation with minimal disruption of treatment in the event of a 
subsequent pandemic; 
g) identify, in collaboration with community-based treatment facilities, levels of service that 
assist in transitioning patients from ASH into clinically appropriate settings as well as ways 
to increase the number of patients that have transitioned into the community without 
readmission to ASH or another facility; and 
h) identify an independent third party, residing outside of Arizona, to investigate incident 
reports and to receive complaints from patients, families and advocates. 
6. Repeals ASH development plan requirements on January 1, 2025. 
Miscellaneous 
7. Adds, to the charge of the Council, reviewing, analyzing and making recommendations on the 
feasibility of transferring ASH to the Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System or an 
alternative oversight entity. 
8. Extends the reporting requirements of the Council for an additional year, until December 31, 
2023. 
9. Delays repeal of the Council from August 31, 2023, to August 31, 2026. 
10. Makes technical and conforming changes. 
11. Becomes effective on the general effective date.